California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-11187
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC
1888 Century Park E Ste 110
Los Angeles, CA 90067-1751
Represented By
David B Golubchik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
89 89 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/09 11:25 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 86 Debtor's Motion For An Order Extending Time To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases, filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC
88 88 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/09 11:23 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 85 Debtor's Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366, filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC
87 87 misc Supplemental Fri 05/09 9:15 AM
Supplemental -[Supplemental Proof Of Service Of: Notice Of Hearing On Motion And Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof [Dkt 85] (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC. (Pagay, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
86 86 motion X - Extend Time (Generic) (motion) Thu 05/08 4:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time -[Notice Of Hearing On Motion And Debtors Motion For An Order Extending Time To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases; Memorandum And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of Jonathan Rollo In Support Thereof (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
85 85 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Thu 05/08 4:40 PM
Motion -[Notice Of Hearing On Motion And Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
84 84 misc Voluntary Dismissal of Motion Wed 05/07 10:36 AM
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion -[Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366 (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC Related [+]. (Pagay, Carmela)
Related: [-] 68 Motion Notice Of Hearing On Motion And Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities And Declaratio
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
83 83 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 05/06 5:50 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+]. COURT RULING: Approve with language in order re allocation. (MB2)
Related: [-] 56 Application to Employ
82 82 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 05/06 5:48 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+]. COURT RULING: Continued to 5/13/25 at 1:00 p.m. to confirm service. (MB2)
Related: [-] 68 Debtor's Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 366
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 05/06 5:49 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 05/13/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1639Los Angeles, CA 90012 for68 , (MB2)
Related: [-] 68 GENERIC MOTION filed by Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC