Member Case
Lead case is: 2:25-bk-11187

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-11206
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
3321 Hyland Ave Ste C
Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1545
Represented By
David B Golubchik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Queenie K Ng
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Noreen A Madoyan
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/20 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
38 38 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) (No PDF) Thu 03/20 11:45 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) Related [+]. (Madoyan, Noreen)
Related: [-] 17 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/20/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/19/2025. (LL2)
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 03/18 5:57 PM
Order granting debtors' emergency motions for interim use of cash collateral on a final basis. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/18/2025 Related [+]. (MB2)
Related: [-] 9 Emergency motion filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
36 36 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 03/11 3:51 PM
Hearing Held re:9 Emergency motion Debtors Emergency Motion For Interim Use Of Cash Collateral Pending Final Hearing Thereon; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC (Golubchik, David). COURT RULING: Grant on a final basis SBA adequate protection payments noted on the record, separate stip re carveout to come. (MB2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
35 35 notice Notice Fri 03/07 3:45 PM
Notice -[Notice Of Joint Administration Of Cases And Requirements For Filing Documents [LBR 1015-1] (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC Related [+]. (Pagay, Carmela)
Related: [-] 18 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Joint Administration of Cases. The lead case is Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC, case number 2:25-bk-11187-DS. Jointly Administered with cases G7 VENICE, LLC, 2:25-bk-11189-DS and GREENLEAF 4 SOCO, LLC, 2:25-bk-11206-DS. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/20/2025. (MB2). Related document(s)7 Ex parte application Debtors Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC. Modified on 2/20/2025 (MB2).
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
34 34 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 03/05 4:29 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
33 33 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 03/05 10:17 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document **Document filed without holographic signature -- Digital signatures are no longer acceptable - Local Bankruptcy Rule 9011-1 is no longer suspended, effective June 28, 2021. All documents requiring debtor(s) signature in the petition and all other deficient documents must be holographic as of 12/1/2017, pursuant to LBR 9011-1/Court Manual Section 3.4. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER DEBTOR HOLOGRAPHIC SIGNATURES. ** Document filed without holographic signature. Related [+] (NV)
Related: [-] 32 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1), Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum), Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B), Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D), Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F), Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G), Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H), Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) (Official Form 107 or 207), Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030), Corporate Ownership Statement
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
32 32 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 03/04 4:00 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sunday, February 23, 2025
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/23 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Saturday, February 22, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF)
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 ORDER for joint administration (BNC-PDF)
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of transfer of case (Inter/Intra District Transfer) (BNC)
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 02/21 3:12 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference. Status conference set on 3/25/25 at 1:00 p.m. (via ZoomGov). (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/21/2025 (MB2)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 02/20 6:03 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+]. COURT RULING: Grant on an interim basis. Final hearing on 3/11/25 at 1:00 p.m. (MB2)
Related: [-] 9 Debtor's Emergency Motion For Interim Use Of Cash Collateral Pending Final Hearing Thereon
22 22 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 02/20 5:52 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+]. COURT RULING: Grant on an interim basis. Final hearing on 3/11/25 at 1:00 p.m. (MB2)
Related: [-] 8 Debtor's Emergency Motion For Authority To (1) Pay Pre- Petition Priority Wages; And (2) Honor Employment And Benefit Policies
21 21 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 02/20 5:50 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+] For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases. COURT RULING: Grant. (MB2)
Related: [-] 7 Ex parte application
20 20 2 pgs order Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF) Thu 02/20 4:44 PM
Order granting debtor's emergency motion for interim use of cash collateral pending final hearing thereon. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/20/2025 (MB2)
Related: [-] 9
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/20 3:14 PM
Order granting debtor's emergency motion for authority to (1) pay pre-petition priority wages; and (2) honor employment and benefit policies. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/20/2025 (MB2)
Related: [-] 8
18 18 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Thu 02/20 3:03 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Joint Administration of Cases. The lead case is Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC, case number 2:25-bk-11187-DS. Jointly Administered with cases G7 VENICE, LLC, 2:25-bk-11189-DS and GREENLEAF 4 SOCO, LLC, 2:25-bk-11206-DS. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/20/2025. (MB2)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Thu 02/20 10:34 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/20/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/19/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice of transfer of case (Inter/Intra District Transfer) (BNC) Thu 02/20 9:01 AM
Notice of transfer of case from SA Division to LA Division (New Case Number 2:25-bk-11206-DS. Previous Case Number: 8:25-bk-10391-TA) (Inter/Intra District Transfer) (BNC) (LL2)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 02/20 5:52 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 03/11/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1639 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for9 , (MB2)
Related: [-] 9 Debtor's Emergency Motion For Interim Use Of Cash Collateral Pending Final Hearing Thereon; filed by Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Wed 02/19 3:32 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (NV)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
14 14 misc Declaration Wed 02/19 1:23 PM
Declaration re: Declaration Of David Golubchik Re: Providing Notice Of Hearings Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 02/19 1:18 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/20/2025 at 12:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 9 Emergency motion filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
12 12 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 02/19 1:17 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/20/2025 at 12:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 8 Emergency motion filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
11 11 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 02/19 1:16 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/20/2025 at 12:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 7 Ex parte application filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
10 10 misc Declaration Wed 02/19 12:40 PM
Declaration re: Omnibus Declaration Of Jonathan Rollo In Support Of First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Emergency motion (motion) Wed 02/19 12:37 PM
Emergency motion Debtors Emergency Motion For Interim Use Of Cash Collateral Pending Final Hearing Thereon; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Emergency motion (motion) Wed 02/19 12:36 PM
Emergency motion Debtors Emergency Motion For Authority To (1) Pay Pre-Petition Priority Wages; And (2) Honor Employment And Benefit Policies; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Ex parte application (motion) Wed 02/19 12:34 PM
Ex parte application Debtors Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Wed 02/19 11:45 AM
Notice of Hearing -[Notice Of Hearings To Consider: (1) Debtors Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases (2) Debtors Emergency Motion For Interim Use Of Cash Collateral Pending Final Hearing Thereon; And (3) Debtors Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Prepetition Priority Wages, And (2) Honor Employment And Benefit Policies (POS Attached)]- Filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Comments Wed 02/19 11:32 AM
Comments: CM/ECF Intradistrict Transfer feature used to transfer case from SA Division to LA Division (New Case Number 2:25-bk-11206-DS. Previous Case Number: 8:25-bk-10391-TA). (LL2)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Wed 02/19 11:20 AM
Judge Deborah J. Saltzman added to case due to related cases filed concurrently: 2:25-bk-11187-DS Greenleaf 2 CPE, LLC., and 2:25-bk-11189-DS G7 Venice, LLC. Involvement of Judge Theodor Albert Terminated . (LL2)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Wed 02/19 3:27 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] List of Equity Security Holders due 3/4/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/4/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 3/4/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 3/4/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 3/4/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 3/4/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/4/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/4/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 3/4/2025. (NV)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 order Change venue/Intra-district Transfer - Bankruptcy (No Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 02/18 5:23 PM
Order Reassigning Bankruptcy Case Pursuant To General Order 11-01 To Judge Deborah J. Saltzman Transfer Case To Los Angeles Division (BNC-PDF). Signed on 2/18/2025. (GD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Tue 02/18 3:40 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 02/18 3:33 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 02/18 2:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 03/4/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/4/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/4/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/4/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/4/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/4/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/4/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/4/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/4/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/4/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 03/4/2025. (Golubchik, David)See docket entry #2 for correction. Case deficient Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/4/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/4/2025. Corporation Ownership Statement due 3/4/2025. Modified on 2/18/2025 (VN)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 02/18 2:25 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:25-bk-10391] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58048247. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Tue 02/18 3:31 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/4/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/4/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/4/2025. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 3/4/2025. (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Greenleaf 4 SOCO, LLC