Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-13093

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:25-ap-00119
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alan Christopher Redmond
Represented By
Albert Anthony Ciardi, III
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Small Business Administration
Represented By
ANTHONY ST. JOSEPH
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Saturday, April 19, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/20 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 order Extend / Shorten Time Thu 04/17 3:27 PM
Ordered that all deadlines established in the Court's March 28, 2025 Pretrial Order are STAYED. The SBA shall file a status report with Chambers on or before June 26, 2025. Related [+] (MK)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 motion Extend / Shorten Time Wed 04/16 3:38 PM
Joint Motion to Extend time to Discovery Schedule Filed by United States Small Business Administration Represented by ANTHONY ST. JOSEPH (Counsel). (ST. JOSEPH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 misc Joint Statement Mon 04/14 12:42 PM
Joint Statement Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/03 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/31 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 03/31 8:37 AM
Pre-Trial Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 7/23/2025 at 02:00 PM at PENN4 - 4TH fl Courtroom. Pre-Trial Statement due by 7/11/2025. Discovery due by 5/20/2025. Joint Statement due by 4/14/2025. (JG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/26 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 3:37 PM
Answer to Complaint ALAN CHRISTOPHER REDMONDS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE DISCHARGEABILITY OF DEBTS FILED BY THE UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION Filed by Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/21 9:32 AM
Fee not applicable. Complaint filed by U.S. SBA. Related [+] (S.)Modified on 2/21/2025 (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-] Doc1
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 02/20 11:44 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Alan Christopher Redmond Date Issued 2/20/2025, Answer Due 3/24/2025. (R., Donna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/19 12:03 PM
Adversary case 25-00119 Complaint by ANTHONY ST. JOSEPH on behalf of United States Small Business Administration against Alan Christopher Redmond. Fee Amount $350 . (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (ST. JOSEPH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Coversheet
Att: 2 Ex A - 2020 Loan v.1
Att: 3 Ex B - 2021 Modifcation v.1
Att: 4 Ex C - 2021 Guarantee v.1
Att: 5 Ex D - 2022 2d Modification v.1
Att: 6 Ex E - 2022 2d Modification Guarantee v.1