Original Case: 2:25-cv-00033

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01279
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 3:17 AM EST
Defendant
SUSAN GIBSON
Defendant
HEATHER REYNOLDS
Defendant
ROBERT DUGGER
Defendant
DANA FOLEY
Defendant
RICK HARING
Defendant
DANIEL KIMICATA
Defendant
JAMES PEPPER
Defendant
KAREN SMITH
Defendant
JENINE ZDANOWICZ
Defendant
CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff - Appellant
KARYN JAKUBIK
Represented By
Edward S. Mazurek
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 3:17 AM EST
Thursday, February 20, 2025
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Karyn Jakubik in District Court No. 2:25-cv-00033. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 3 5 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 4 2 pgs ORDER
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (LMR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Edward S. Mazurek, Esq. the designated filer shall be Karyn Jakubik. (LMR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Appellants seek review of the District Court?s order entered January 13, 2025. The order did not dismiss the claims of all parties, therefore, the order appealed may not be final within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1291 or otherwise appealable at this time. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (LMR)
Related: [-]