Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:25-cv-00998
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:56 AM EDT
Defendant
And all Others
Defendant
William Lovejoy, Jr.
6680 Woodfield Lane
Rex, GA 30273
Plaintiff
Armm Asset Company 2 LLC


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:46 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b),7 Notice of Appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant William Lovejoy, Jr. failed to file a Transcript Order Form in both this Court and the district court and failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 25-10849 J. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Tue 03/18 10:50 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of7 Notice of Appeal filed by William Lovejoy, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 25-10849 J. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 appeal Documents forwarded to USCA Fri 03/14 10:51 AM
Corrected USDC Order forwarded to USCA re:7 Notice of Appeal filed by William Lovejoy, Jr. (pjm)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Remark Fri 03/14 9:55 AM
Case electronically remanded to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County re [5-1] Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically through Odyssey. Filing Status: Submitted. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Fri 03/14 9:39 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re5 Order. Correct order added to entry. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/14 9:43 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William Lovejoy, Jr. re [5-1] Order. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 03/13 3:47 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:7 Notice of Appeal. There is no transcript. Appellant has been GRANTED in forma pauperis. The District Judge is Eleanor L. Ross. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/13 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order, by William Lovejoy, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
6 6 utility Remark Thu 02/27 2:33 PM
Case electronically remanded to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County re5 Order. Copy of order sent electronically. Filing Status: Submitted. (ajw)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
ORDER: Because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, it cannot reach Defendant's request for relief and instead must remand this action. The Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia and DIRECTS the Clerk to TERMINATE this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 02/27/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
4 4 12 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS(mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/27 12:57 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to William Lovejoy, Jr. as to William Lovejoy, Jr. re4 Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/27 2:28 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William Lovejoy, Jr. re5 Order. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/27 2:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with INJ and TRO filed by William Lovejoy, Jr.(klb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 4 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/26 3:36 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for dispositionof defendant's request for emergency relief and a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Additionally, the undersigned REPORTS that this action should be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 2/26/25. c:Financial Office(klb)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/26 2:05 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Lovejoy, Jr.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal with INJ and TRO,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/26 2:06 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/26 3:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William Lovejoy, Jr. re2 Order. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 02/26 3:41 PM
Submission of3 Notice of Removal, for disposition of defendant's request for emergency relief and frivolity determination, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (klb)
Related: [-]