Original Case: 1:25-cv-00998

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-10849
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
WILLIAM LOVEJOY, JR.
Represented By
William Lovejoy Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ARMM ASSET COMPANY 2 LLC


Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 4:16 AM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant William Lovejoy, Jr. on 03/12/2025. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/07/2025 as to Appellant William Lovejoy Jr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/15/2025 as to Appellee Armm Asset Company 2 LLC.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 4 pgs DC Order doc#5
Att: 3 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing