|
GPO
Oct 06 2008
ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF, granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/06/08. (LJG)
|
|
GPO
Oct 09 2008
ORDER denying 14 Ritchie Capital Management, et al.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 17 William Procida's Motion to Intervene; denying 17 William Procida's Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 32 Interlachen Harriet Investments Limited's Motion for leave to appear as an interested party(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/09/2008. (tlu)
|
|
GPO
Oct 14 2008
ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/14/2008. (tlu)
|
|
GPO
Oct 15 2008
ORDER TO MODIFY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/15/2008. (tlu)
|
|
GPO
Oct 16 2008
ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/16/2008. (tlu)
|
|
GPO
Nov 04 2008
ORDER Approving the Sale of Real Property Located at 500 Weatherby Way, Bismarck, North Dakota, 58503, purusant to the Stipulation 74 filed by the parties and Receiver Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/04/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 06 2008
ORDER Approving the Sale of Real Property Located at 24 Ocean Drive, Tequesta, Florida 33469, pursuant to the Stipulation 77 filed by the parties and Receiver Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/06/08. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 12 2008
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Intervene; denying 139 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene. The motions by LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are GRANTED as to the request to intervene for the requested, limited purpose; the motions by LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are DENIED as to the requests to clarify, modify, or lift the stay of litigation;having denied the requests for relief from the stay of litigation, LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are terminated as intervening parties in this action (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/12/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 16 2008
ORDER Approving 134 Motion for Payments to Preserve Assets and Payments of Living Expenses (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/16/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 18 2008
ORDER re 138 Affidavit in Support of Fee application filed by Gary Hansen; arguments on Receiver Hansen's applications will be heard at the hearing scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on December 23, 2008, regarding Receiver Kelley's Motion to Approve Payments of Receiver and Attorney Fees 152. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/18/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2008
ORDER granting 152 Receiver Kelley's Motion to Approve Fees to Receiver and Attorneys (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2008
ORDER granting 138 Receiver Hansen's Affidavit in Support of Fee Applications(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2008
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re [162 and 163] Orders to clarify that no objections to Receiver Kelley's or Receiver Hansen's requests were made by Plaintiff the United States of America or any other interested party. Also during the course of the December 23, 2008 hearing, the Court considered the First Status Reports of Receiver Kelley 160 and Receiver Hansen 159, which describe the activities that the receivers have undertaken to date. The Court accepted the reports and ordered that Receiver Kelley's and Receiver Hansen's next status reports are due in 60 days (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 24 2008
ORDER APPROVING THE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND BUSINESS LOCATED AT 675 HIGHWAY 7 EXCELSIOR, MINNESOTA 55331 pursuant to the 166 Affidavit and 164 Stipulation, filed by Douglas A Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/24/2008. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Mar 20 2009
ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENTS re 191 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Approve Payments for Receiver and Attorney Fees filed by Douglas A Kelley, 195 MOTION for Attorney Fees and to Approve Payments to Receiver filed by Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/20/09. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Mar 25 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Receiver Kelley's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Douglas A Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/25/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Apr 13 2009
ORDER Approving the Sale of 2004 Tiara 2900 Coronet Boat Belonging to Thomas J. Petters pursuant to 237 Amended Stipulation filed by Douglas A. Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/13/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Apr 29 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 225 Ritchie's Second Emergency Motion to Intervene for the Purpose of Vacating the Preliminary Injunction as to PGW (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/29/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 23 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 255 J.P. Morgan's Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/23/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 26 2009
ORDER granting 388 Motion for Approval of Strict Foreclosure Agreement between Petters Aviation Leasing LLC and CIT Leasing Corporation (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/26/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 30 2009
ORDER re 434 Stipulation filed by United States of America, Frank E. Vennes, Jr. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/30/09. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 30 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 331 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley & Wolter P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 335 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 339 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting 343 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers Corporate Advisory and Restructuring LLC; granting 347 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting 351 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 355 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.; granting 359 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting in part and denying in part 363 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 367 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting in part and denying in part 371 Motion for Attorney Fees of Joseph S. Friedberg, Chartered (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/30/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jul 01 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 328 Defendant Petters' Motion to Bar Receiver From Providing Data to the Prosecution And For The United States to Pay Receivership Costs (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/01/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Sep 01 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 469 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Kelley & Wolter; granting in part and denying in part 473 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Linquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 477 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Felhaber, Larson, Fenlong & Vogt; granting 481 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/01/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Oct 14 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 634 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting in part and denying in part 638 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/14/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 10 2009
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 688 Motion for Attorney Fees to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting 692 Motion for Attorney Fees to Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/10/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 23 2009
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 702 Motion for Attorney Fees as to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.; granting 706 Motion for Attorney Fees as to Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/23/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 25 2009
ORDER Approving the Sale of Polaroid Labs, LLC Patent Applications pursuant to 728 Stipulation filed by Douglas A Kelley, United States of America (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/25/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 25 2009
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 718 Motion for Attorney Fees to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon and Vogt, P.A.; granting 722 Motion for Attorney Fees to Paul Engh(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/25/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 04 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 735 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; denying without prejudice 743 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard; granting in part and denying in part 747 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Voft; granting 751 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; the Motion as to Susman's fee petition [Docket Number 739] remains under advisement pending Receiver Kelley's providing to the Court on or before December 15, 2009 for the Court's in camera review a narrative description of the services performed by Susman (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/04/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 17 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 739 Motion for Attorney Fees of Susman Godfrey LLP; granting 765 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting 769 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 773 Motion for Attorney Fees of Susman Godfrey, LLP. Receiver Kelley's motions are CONTINUED as to Docket Nos. 777 and 781 until December 22, 2009. Any objection by the Government to the continued motions must be filed by that date (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/17/2009. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jan 11 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 806 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting 810 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting 814 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel; granting 818 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 822 Motion for Attorney Fees of Peter B. Wold; granting 826 Motion for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt; granting in part and denying in part 830 Motion for Attorney Fees of Best & Flanagan; granting 834 Motion for Attorney Fees of Sands & Moskowitz; granting 838 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 842 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 1/11/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Feb 09 2010
ORDER granting 851 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting 859 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting in part and denying in part 879 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, PA. Receiver Kelley's motions are CONTINUED as to Docket Nos. 855, 863, 867, 871, and 875. Receiver Kelley and the Government shall confer regarding an agreed-upon level of specificity to be included in pending and future motions to approve professional fees. On or before February 18, 2010, the Receiver and Government shall file with the Court a joint proposal regarding the additional specificity, if any, to be included in pending and future fee petitions (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/09/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Apr 23 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 962 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting in part and denying in part 966 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 970 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 974 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/23/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Apr 29 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 986 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting in part and denying in part 990 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum; granting 994 Motion for Attorney Fees of Maslon, Edelman, Borman & Brand; granting 998 Motion for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass; granting in part and denying in part 1002 Motion for Attorney Fees of Pillsbury, Winthrop, Shaw, Pitman; granting in part and denying in part 1006 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/29/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 05 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1018 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting in part and denying in part 1022 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennnum; granting in part and denying in part 1026 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/05/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 11 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1030 Motion for Attorney Fees of Haynes and Boone; granting 1034 Motion for Attorney Fees of James E. Ostgard; granting 1038 Motion for Attorney Fees of Dorsey & Whitney; granting in part and denying in part 1042 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1046 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers; granting 1050 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/11/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 17 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1071 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting 1075 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1079 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers; granting in part and denying in part 1083 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 1088 Motion for Attorney Fees of Frederic Bruno & Associates; granting 1092 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/17/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 21 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINON AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1107 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting 1111 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1115 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/21/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 27 2010
ORDER granting 1102 Motion for Attorney Fees Related to Frank E. Vennes(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/27/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2010
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1123 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1127 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1131 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1135 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1139 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1144 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 6/2/2010. (GS)
|
|
GPO
Aug 11 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1201 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting 1214 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 1218 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1222 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/11/10. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Aug 26 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1246 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Reconsideration of Stratify Costs Deducted from Fee Applications Filed in Favor of Pricewaterhouse Coopers, LLP (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/26/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Aug 31 2010
ORDER For Authorization to Make Payments for Services to the Receivership granting 1380 Motion for Attorney Fees of Fruth, Jamison & Elsass; granting 1385 Motion for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/31/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Aug 31 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1256 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 1260 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1265 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP. Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. shall provide task based billing statements for all services performed after the date of this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/31/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Sep 15 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1280 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley Wolter & Scott; granting 1284 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1288 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1302 Motion for Attorney Fees of Sands & Moskowitz; granting in part and denying in part 1306 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard PA; granting 1310 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting 1314 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, PA; granting 1318 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting in part and denying in part 1322 Motion for Attorney Fees of Frederic Bruno & Associates; granting 1326 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 1330 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/15/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Sep 23 2010
ORDER granting 1353 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1358 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 1362 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 1366 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/23/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Sep 30 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1401 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting 1405 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 1409 Motion for Attorney Fees Dorsey & Whitney, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1413 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting in part and denying in part 1417 Motion for Attorney Fees of Haynes and Boone, LLP; granting 1421 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting in part and denying in part 1425 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1429 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard, Street & Deinard (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/30/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Oct 19 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1484 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel; granting 1488 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting in part and denying in part 1492 Motion for Attorney Fees of Fruth, Jamison & Elsass; granting 1496 Motion for Attorney Fees of Dorsey & Whitney; granting in part and denying in part 1500 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhoueCoopers (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/19/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Oct 19 2010
ORDER denying 1474 Antoinette Reynolds' Motion to Intervene and granting Partial Emergency Relief (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/19/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1509 Motion for Attorney Fees of Joseph S. Friedberg; granting in part and denying in part 1513 Motion for Attorney Fees of Frederic Bruno & Associates; granting 1517 Motion for Attorney Fees of Haynes & Boone (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/20/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2010
ORDER for Authorization to Make Payments Related to Frank E. Vennes; granting in part and denying in part 1525 Motion for Attorney Fees for Faegre & Benson, Holland & Knight, Ruden & McClosky, Oppenheimer, Baker Tilly Virchow Krause (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/20/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Nov 16 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Asset Based Resource Group's 1272 Motion Terminate Receivership and Discharge Receiver as to Petters Aircraft Leasing, LLC or in the Alternative to Appoint an Independent Receiver (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/16/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Dec 06 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1474 Antoinette Reynolds' MOTION for Emergency Relief to the extent it seeks payment of living expenses beyond health insurance premiums (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/06/2010. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jan 25 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1589 Motion to Intervene; having been heard on the Joint Motion to Approve the Asset Distribution Plan, the Palm Beach Trustee is terminated as an intervening party in this action; granting 1652 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Asset Distristribution Plan) in accordance with this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/25/2011. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Feb 10 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1615 Motion for Order of Sale of Tribute Sounds Catalog; denying 1619 Motion for Order to Release Funds from the Q Records and Entertainment Checking Account; granting 1623 Motion for Order of Sale of the House of Beauty Catalog of Music; granting in part and denying in part 1656 Motion for Division of Proceeds from the sale of the Catain home or, alternatively, an extention of monthly living expenses; denying 1657 Motion requesting an accounting and award of Q Records' funds and release of Q Records' ownership rights and interests (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/10/11. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Mar 30 2011
ORDER granting 1783 Motion for Authorization to Vote Shares of New Common Stock in MN Airline Holdings, Inc. held by Thomas J. Petters and Petters Aircraft Leasing, LLC (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/30/2011. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
May 03 2011
ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENTS; granting 1811 Motion for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC; granting 1814 Motion for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, PA; denying 1817 Motion for Attorney Fees Leonard Street & Deinard; granting 1820 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1823 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1826 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1829 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1832 Motion for Attorney Fees Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Voft, PA; granting in part and denying in part 1835 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1838 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1841 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting 1844 Motion for Attorney Fees of Tonya Rosso; granting 1847 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/03/2011. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Mar 12 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2133 Mukamal's Motion to Intervene; denying 2136 Mukamal's Motion to Lift Stay (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/12/2012. (TLU) cc: Peter J. Leveton Modified on 3/12/2012 (jam).
|
|
GPO
Mar 26 2013
ORDER AUTHORIZING AND CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN THE RETREAT AND DOUGLAS A. KELLEY, RECEIVER; granting 2447 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/26/2013. (TLU) cc: Peter J. Leveton. Modified on 3/27/2013 (lmb).
|
|
GPO
Jul 26 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2486 Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/26/2013. (GS) cc: Peter J. Leveton. Modified on 7/26/2013 (lmb).
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2014
ORDER REGARDING PAYMENTS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES OF FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP AND DIRECTING TRANSFER OF VENNES RELATED FUNDS BEING HELD IN TRUST BY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP; granting in part and denying in part 2700 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2014. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jun 08 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2724 Trustee Gary Hansen's Motion to Compel Funds from Defendant Frank E. Vennes, Jr. and his attorneys James Volling and Faegre Baker Daniels LLP and Kimberly Vennes and for an Accounting (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/08/2015. (TLU). cc: Leveton on 6/17/2015 (KNK).
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2710 Ritchie Capital Management, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II. Ltd.; and Ritchie Capital Management Ltd.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 2714 Ritchie Capital Management, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II. Ltd.; and Ritchie Capital Management Ltd.'s Motion to Lift Stay; granting 2757 Yorkville Investment I, L.L.C.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 2757 Yorkville Investment I, L.L.C.'s Motion to Lift Stay; granting 2766 John R. Stoebner, in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee of Polaroid Corporation, et al., Douglas A. Kelley, in his capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of Petters Company Inc., et al., and Randall L. Seaver, in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee of Petters Capital, LLC's Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/14/2015. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Aug 03 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2820 Defendant Frank E. Vennes, Jr.'s Motion to Compel Public Accounting or Report; denying 2824 Defendant Frank E. Vennes, Jr.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Public Accounting or Report Should Not Issue (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/03/2016. (TLU) (Cc: F. Vennes and P. Leveton) Modified docket text on 8/5/2016 (TSS).
|
|
GPO
Sep 15 2016
ORDER denying 2827 Defendant Frank E. Vennes, Jr.'s Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/15/2016. (TLU). (Cc: F. Vennes and P. Leveton) modified on 9/16/2016 (KNK).
|
|
GPO
Sep 27 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2897 Intervenors Ritchie Capital Management, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II, Ltd.; Yorkville Investment I, L.L.C., and Ritchie Capital Management, Ltd.'s Motion to Terminate Receivership or, Alternatively, to Lift the Litigation Stay Against Thomas J. Petters (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/27/2017. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jan 08 2021
ORDER TERMINATING THE RECEIVERSHIP OF DEFENDANT THOMAS J. PETTERS AND DISSOLVING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; granting 3214 Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and to Terminate the Receivership of Defendant Thomas J. Petters (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 1/8/2021. (TLU)
|
|
GPO
Jul 29 2021
ORDER granting 3235 Receiver's Motion To Approve Final Fees and Costs to the Receiver and His Professionals, Close the Receivership and Discharge the Receiver and Establish Procedures for Record Retention and Authorize Destruction of Receivership Records and Miscellaneous Property (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/29/2021. (TLU)
|