Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:25-bk-50432
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC
2501 N Harwood St Ste 1850
Dallas, TX 75201-1607
Represented By
J Seth Moore
Snell & Wilmer
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order Regarding (related document(s):27 Motion for Order Authorizing (I) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, (II) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and (III) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (21 Day Objection Language) filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moore, J)Modified on 4/11/2025 .) (Order entered on 5/5/2025)
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Regarding (related document(s):25 Amended Application Authorizing Employment and Retention of Snell & Wilmer as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (21 Day Objection Language) filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order # 2 Affidavit of J. Seth Moore # 3 Appendix L-2014-1)(Moore, J)Modified on 4/11/2025 .) (Order entered on 5/5/2025)
Monday, May 05, 2025
34 34 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 05/05 3:06 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/5/2025) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 27 Motion for Order Authorizing (I) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, (II) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and (III) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (21 Day Objection Language) filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moore, J)Modified on 4/11/2025 .
33 33 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 05/05 3:03 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/5/2025) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 25 Amended Application Authorizing Employment and Retention of Snell & Wilmer as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (21 Day Objection Language) filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order # 2 Affidavit of J. Seth Moore # 3 Appendix L-2014-1)(Moore, J)Modified on 4/11/2025 .
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/28 1:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
Hearing RESET Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Related Document(s):16 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. Hearing Scheduled For 5/19/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***HEARING RESET IN OPEN COURT ON 4/28/25 - NFN*** (Flores, Roxanne
Monday, April 21, 2025
trustee UST 341 Meeting Held/Not Held Mon 04/21 1:47 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Proceeding Concluded. ; (Rose, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
31 31 answer Response Fri 04/11 2:26 PM
Response Filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Moore, J) Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B)(Greer, Dean) (Related Document(s):16 Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( Filing Fee: $ 199.00 ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Service List))
Att: 1 Affidavit of Albert Dehoyos ISO Response in Opposition
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 misc ~Document Thu 04/10 3:03 PM
Notice Regarding Adjourned 341 Meeting of Creditors filed by James W Rose Jrfor U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - SA12. (Rose, James) Related [+]
Related: [-] 29 US Trustee 341 Meeting Continued: Set For 4/21/2025 at 01:00 PM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#
29 29 trustee UST 341 Meeting Continued Thu 04/10 2:56 PM
US Trustee 341 Meeting Continued: Set For 4/21/2025 at 01:00 PM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921# (Rose, James)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J) Related [+]
Related: [-] 27 Motion for Order Authorizing Continued use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Continued use of Existing Business Forms filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Authorizing Continued use of existing cash management system)
27 27 motion ~Motion (Generic) Thu 04/10 9:04 AM
Motion for Order Authorizing Continued use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Continued use of Existing Business Forms filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC(Moore, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Authorizing Continued use of existing cash management system
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
26 26 2 pgs plan Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 12:58 PM
Disclosure Statement filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion ~Application (Generic) Wed 04/09 12:53 PM
Amended Application Amended Application for Employment filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC(Moore, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Att: 2 Affidavit of J. Seth Moore
Att: 3 Appendix L-2014-1
Thursday, April 03, 2025
24 24 order Dismissing Pleading for Lack of Compliance (pdf) Thu 04/03 3:39 PM
Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance Related [+] (Order entered on 4/3/2025) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 21 Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Snell & Wilmer as Counsel for Debtor filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Seth Moore # 3 Appendix Appendix L-2014-1)
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/02 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL ROXANNE MUJICA AT: roxanne_mujica@txwb.uscourts.gov ) (Related Document(s):18 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Greer, Dean) (Related Document(s):16 Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P.)) Hearing Scheduled For 4/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3
22 22 2 pgs plan Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/02 1:58 PM
Disclosure Statement filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion ~Application (Generic) Wed 04/02 1:56 PM
Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Snell & Wilmer as Counsel for Debtor filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC(Moore, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Seth Moore
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix L-2014-1
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 court Hearing (F) Mon 03/31 11:59 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL ROXANNE MUJICA AT: roxanne_mujica@txwb.uscourts.gov ) Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 4/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 (Torres, Krystal)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Greer, Dean) (Related Document(s):16 Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P.)
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/31 11:08 AM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P..(Greer, Dean) Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B)(Greer, Dean) (Related Document(s):16 Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( Filing Fee: $ 199.00 ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Service List))
Att: 1 Service List
18 18 motion Relief From Stay Mon 03/31 10:49 AM
Amended Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P.(Greer, Dean) Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( Filing Fee: $ 199.00 ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Service List)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 03/28 12:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P..(Greer, Dean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
16 16 motion Relief From Stay Fri 03/28 12:16 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay ( 14 Day Objection Language ) ( Filing Fee: $ 199.00 ) filed by Dean William Greer for Creditor H&K Homes, L.P.(Greer, Dean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Service List
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Fri 03/28 12:45 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Motion Relief from Stay([LINK 25-50432 cag] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00), Amount $ 199.00, Receipt A25231369 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
Thursday, March 20, 2025
15 15 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 03/20 10:51 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-] stricted Document10 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/25/2025,11 Schedules filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/25/2025
14 14 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 03/20 10:50 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/11/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 07/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2025,,9 Declaration For Electronic Filing Due Notice Sent to Attorney for Debtor(s). (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/11/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 07/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2025, (Moore, J)) - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/31/2025. (Admin)
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/19 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Declaration For Electronic Filing Due Notice Sent to Attorney for Debtor(s). (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/11/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 07/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2025, (Moore, J)) - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/31/2025. (Admin)
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 misc ~Document Tue 03/18 4:52 PM
Declaration filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. (Moore, J) Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Schedules filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/25/2025
11 11 misc Schedules Tue 03/18 4:48 PM
Schedules filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/25/2025 (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 03/18 4:44 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor Blackbrush Investments LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/25/2025 (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 court Notice-Declaration For Electronic Filing Due (F) (AD) Mon 03/17 6:01 PM
Declaration For Electronic Filing Due Notice Sent to Attorney for Debtor(s). Related [+] - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/31/2025. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/11/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 07/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2025, (Moore, J)
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 03/14 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Ryan J. Bigbee for Creditor JNL Steel Components, Inc.. (Bigbee, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 03/13 4:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Shane M Bebout for Creditor Todd, Barron, Thomason, Hudman, Bebout & Rodriguez, P.C.. (Bebout, Shane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 03/11 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Karalyssa C Casillas for Creditors Ector CAD, Bexar County. (Casillas, Karalyssa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#- Proofs of Claim Due 7/9/2025
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (F) Wed 03/05 10:11 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#- Proofs of Claim Due 7/9/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Wed 03/05 7:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST James W Rose Jr (Rose, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 misc ~Document Tue 03/04 3:35 PM
List of Creditors Verification filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc 10 or 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 03/04 3:27 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors List filed by J Seth Moore for Debtor BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Tue 03/04 12:25 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By BLACKBRUSH INVESTMENTS LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/11/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 07/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2025, (Moore, J)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 03/04 12:28 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-50432 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25165686 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1