Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 2:25-bk-00397
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2025

Debtor
Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC
2430 Vanderbilt Beach Rd Ste 108-564
Naples, FL 34109-2654
Represented By
Jamie Zysk Isani
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
157 157 notice Notice of Filing (BK) Wed 05/21 12:47 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Budget Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Wuebker, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 24
156 156 notice Notice of Filing (BK) Wed 05/21 11:07 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms and Continue to Use Existing Cash Management System; (II) Granting Administrative Expense Status for Intercompany Claims; and (III) Waiving the Requirements of Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Wuebker, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
155 155 notice Notice of Compliance (BK) Tue 05/20 5:09 PM
Notice of Compliance with Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sameer K. Kapoor Filed by Seann Frazier on behalf of Creditor St. Joseph's/Candler Health System, Inc. Related [+]. (Frazier, Seann)
Related: [-] 114
154 154 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Tue 05/20 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Re: St. Josephs/Candler Health System, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Debtor To Assume Or Reject Executory Contract Filed by Seann Frazier on behalf of Creditor St. Joseph's/Candler Health System, Inc. Related [+]. (Frazier, Seann)
Related: [-] 150
153 153 misc Declaration Tue 05/20 4:18 PM
Declaration re: Supplemental Declaration of John Elrod in Support of Application for Approval of Employment of Greenberg Traurig, LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by John D Elrod on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Elrod, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
152 152 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/19 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lance Bergmann Melamud on behalf of Creditor William Kapp. (Melamud, Lance)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 17, 2025
151 151 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/18 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #148 )
Friday, May 16, 2025
150 150 motion Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract Fri 05/16 4:35 PM
Motion to ASSUME OR REJECT EXECUTORY CONTRACT PURSUANT TO SECTION 365(d)(2) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, AND FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION Filed by Seann Frazier on behalf of Creditor St. Joseph's/Candler Health System, Inc.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Electronic Filing Declaration of Tyler Sanders in Support of St. Joseph's/Candler's Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit List in Support of Motion
149 149 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Fri 05/16 12:37 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Filed by Nicholas S. Monico on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Monico, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 148 ,147
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Fri 05/16 10:14 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on May 15, 2025, by Attorney John D Elrod of Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Terminus 200 - 3333 Piedmont Road, NE, Suite 2500 - Atlanta, GA 30305. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
148 148 order Generic Order Thu 05/15 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of an Order (1) Authorizing Payment of Expense Deposits in Connection with DIP Financing, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jennifer Wuebker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura S.)
Related: [-] 136
147 147 order Generic Order Thu 05/15 3:42 PM
Order Granting Motion for (I) Debtors to Continue and Renew Their Insurance Programs and Honor All Obligations in Respect Thereof, (II) Debtors Entry into the Premium Financing Agreement. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jennifer Wuebker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 137
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
146 146 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 05/15 12:11 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Brian Yates, Courtney Roman, Craig Boudreaux, David Garbett, Geoffrey Richards, Heather Williams, Jennifer Wuebker, John Elrod, Joy Kleisinger, Justin Paget, Bryan Day, Nicholas Monico, Patricia Redmond, Phillip Martin, Robert Ciobani, Sameer Kapoor, Simon Wein, Suzanne Roski, Venel Pierre Louis, Ben Lambers WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: ~(1) Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Expense Deposits in Connection with DIP Financing, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Doc #136 - Continued to 5/19/2025 at 11:30 am, Announced in Open Court, if parties submit an agreed upon order hearing will be cancelled -Limited Objection to the Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Payment of Expense Deposits in Connection with DIP Financing, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patricia Redmond on behalf of Creditor Amerant Bank, N.A.; Doc. # 142 ~(2) Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing (I) Debtors to Continue and Renew Their Insurance Programs and Honor All Obligations in Respect Thereof, (II) Debtors Entry Into the Premium Financing Agreement, and (III) Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Doc #137 - Granted O/Paget Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
145 145 notice Notice of Filing (BK) Wed 05/14 12:33 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing (I) Debtors to Continue and Renew Their Insurance Programs and Honor All Obligations in Respect Thereof, (II) Debtors Entry Into the Premium Financing Agreement, and (III) Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Wuebker, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 137
144 144 notice Notice of Filing (BK) Wed 05/14 12:28 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Expense Deposits In Connection with DIP Financing, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Jennifer Ellen Wuebker on behalf of Debtor Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Wuebker, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 136