Member Case
Lead case is: 2:25-bk-00397

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 2:25-bk-00398
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2025

Debtor
Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC
27200 Riverview Center Blvd Ste 206
Bonita Springs, FL 34134-4317
Represented By
Jamie Zysk Isani
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Wed 04/23 1:43 AM
Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets Filed by Nicholas S. Monico on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC. (Monico, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Tue 03/25 6:02 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Nicholas S. Monico on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Monico, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Tue 03/25 12:51 PM
Notice (Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) Filed by Nicholas S. Monico on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC. (Monico, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Tue 03/18 8:17 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Benjamin E. Lambers on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - FTM. (Lambers, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/13 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Thu 03/13 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/11 1:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brian P Yates on behalf of Creditor Amerant Bank NA. (Yates, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 order Joint Administration Mon 03/10 11:10 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 2:25-bk-397. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jamie Isani is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Mon 03/10 10:29 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets and Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Case Management Summary, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney. Creditors Not Uploaded . (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Mon 03/10 8:59 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 03/10 8:58 AM
Related: [-]
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Mon 03/10 9:00 AM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Motion for Joint Administration to be heard on or before 03/13/2025 Filed by Jamie Zysk Isani on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC Related [+]. (Isani, Jamie)
Related: [-] 4
court (NO PAPER) - Notice of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases Mon 03/10 11:13 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 2:25-bk-00397-FMD Related [+]. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 7
Sunday, March 09, 2025
3 3 answer Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Mon 03/10 8:57 AM
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Jamie Zysk Isani on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 03/10 8:56 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Landmark Holdings of Florida, LLC. Filed by Jamie Zysk Isani on behalf of Debtor Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 03/09 4:53 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. Health Care Business. (Fee Paid.). 20 Largest List of Unsecured Creditors. List of Equity Security Holders. Filed by Jamie Zysk Isani on behalf of Landmark Management Services of Florida, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/7/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 07/7/2025. (Isani, Jamie)Modified on 3/10/2025 (DK). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/10/2025) (Kerkes, Deborah)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Sun 03/09 5:15 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-00398] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A78845831, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Sun 03/09 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]