Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:25-bk-50501
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025

Debtor
Brown & Brown Resources, Inc.
2018 Avenue B Ste 200
San Antonio, TX 78215-1171
Represented By
William R. Davis, Jr
Langley & Banack, Inc.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
86 86 court Hearing (F) Thu 05/08 2:56 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 85 Application to Employ Accountant, Don Wilson, CPA, PC filed by William R. Davis Jr. for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 6/4/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
85 85 motion Employ Thu 05/08 1:30 PM
Application to Employ Accountant, Don Wilson, CPA, PC filed by William R. Davis Jr for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc.(Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, May 04, 2025
84 84 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 83 Final Order Regarding (related document(s):7 Application For Authorization to Use Cash Collateral filed by William R. Davis Jr for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 5/2/2025)
Friday, May 02, 2025
83 83 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Fri 05/02 7:36 AM
Final Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/2/2025) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 7 Application For Authorization to Use Cash Collateral filed by William R. Davis Jr for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order)
Thursday, May 01, 2025
82 82 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 77 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) (Related Document(s):76 Second Supplement to Application For Authorization to Use Cash Collateral filed by William R. Davis Jr. for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc.. (Related Document(s):7 Application For Authorization to Use Cash Collateral filed by William R. Davis Jr. for Debtor Brown & Brown Resources, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 4/30/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.