District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00776
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 11:05 PM EDT
Defendant
JOE BIDEN
Defendant
JOHN DAHL
Defendant
ELENA ECHENIQUE
Defendant
JOHN LENNON
Defendant
JULIAN LENNON
Defendant
MARLENE H. ECHENIQUE MCBRIDE
Defendant
LAMELA SMITH
Defendant
PAMELA SMITH
82 Majors Lane
Union Springs, AL 36089
Defendant
JAZMIN SOLOMON
Defendant
LAMELA MIA SOLOMON
Defendant
TABITHA MARLENE SUAREZ
Plaintiff
IVETTE T. ECHENIQUE
P.O. Box 132 (Homeless)
Dalton, GA 30722

GPO Mar 27 2025
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2025. (zmtm)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/30 1:07 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5153 for11 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by IVETTE T. ECHENIQUE. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 04/28 3:35 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re11 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 04/28 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to9 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by IVETTE T. ECHENIQUE. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Request for Leave to File Review Tue 04/15 2:26 PM
REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVIEW. The attached document requires leave to file: Plaintiff's Notice. Reason(s): Case is closed. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Thu 03/27 3:22 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2025. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 03/27 3:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2025. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Tue 03/18 11:44 AM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/3/2025. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmtm)
Related: [-]