Original Case: 1:25-cv-00776

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05156
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Former President, Vice President, and Senator
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Marlene H. Echenique McBride
Defendant - Appellee
Lamela Mia Solomon
Defendant - Appellee
Julian Lennon
Defendant - Appellee
Lamela Smith
Defendant - Appellee
Pamela Smith
Defendant - Appellee
John Dahl
Defendant - Appellee
John Lennon
Defendant - Appellee
Elena Echenique
Defendant - Appellee
Jazmin Solomon
Defendant - Appellee
Tabitha Marlene Suarez
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ivette T. Echenique
Represented By
Ivette T. Echenique
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 4:19 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5156
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2113637] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 8585 46] of order [2113629-4]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/30/2025 from Ivette T. Echenique. 25-5156
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF APPEAL [2113623] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00776-UNA filed by Ivette T. Echenique. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5156 25-5156
Related: [-]
CLERK'S ORDER [2113629] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/20/2025. APPENDIX due 06/20/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-5156
Related: [-]