Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:11-bk-45107

Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul B Snyder
Case #: 3:25-ap-04023
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lewis County, a County
Represented By
Lewis County
contact info
Plaintiff
The Benaroya Company LLC, a Washington limited liability company
Represented By
Alan B Bornstein
Jameson Pepple Cantu PLLC
contact info
Evan Charles Heaney
Jameson Pepple Cantu PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 misc Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 05/07 8:11 AM
Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing . Filed by Susan M Edison on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Edison, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 8:52 AM
Notice of Appearance for Defendant Lewis County Filed by David E Bailey on behalf of Lewis County. (Bailey, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 ans Declaration Wed 03/26 2:05 PM
Declaration of Mailing ... Filed by Alan B Bornstein of Jameson Pepple Cantu PLLC on behalf of The Benaroya Company LLC. (Bornstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 court Summons and Pretrial Conference Thu 03/20 1:32 PM
Summons issued to Plaintiff's Attorneys Alan B Bornstein and Evan Charles Heaney for Service on Lewis County Answer Due 4/21/2025 . (AMT)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Change in Assigned Judge Thu 03/20 11:40 AM
Notice of Change in Assigned Judge. (RAO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 notice ~Generic~ Notice Tue 03/18 3:54 PM
Notice of Case Coversheet Filed by Alan B Bornstein on behalf of The Benaroya Company LLC. (Bornstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 03/18 2:21 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed.. Filed by Alan B Bornstein on behalf of THE BENAROYA COMPANY, L.L.C.. (Bornstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent Tue 03/18 2:13 PM
Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent . Filed by Alan B Bornstein of Jameson Pepple Cantu PLLC on behalf of THE BENAROYA COMPANY, L.L.C.. (Bornstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 03/18 1:57 PM
Adversary case[LINK 25-04023 . Adversary case 25-04023 Complaint by THE BENAROYA COMPANY, L.L.C. (attorneys Alan B Bornstein, Evan Charles Heaney, Alan B Bornstein) against Lewis County. . Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Bornstein, Alan)
Related: [-]