Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul B Snyder
Case #: 3:11-bk-45107
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2011
Terminated:Jul 16, 2014

Debtor
Sovran LLC
4405 7th Ave SE Ste 301
Lacey, WA 98503-1055
Represented By
Richard G Birinyi
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
William L. Courshon
contact info
Marjorie S Raleigh
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/27/2013 7:01 PM PST
Thursday, June 23, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 11-45107 [misc,1032] (1039.00). Receipt number 13434312. Fee amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Schedule A due 07/7/2011. Schedule B due 07/7/2011. Schedule C due 07/7/2011. Schedule D due 07/7/2011. Schedule E due 07/7/2011. Schedule F due 07/7/2011. Schedule G due 07/7/2011. Schedule H due 07/7/2011. Schedule I due 07/7/2011. Schedule J due 07/7/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/7/2011. Schedules A-J due 07/7/2011. Schedules and Statements must be filed on Revised Forms. Due 07/7/2011. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 07/7/2011. Summary of schedules due 07/7/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 07/7/2011. Filed by Richard G Birinyi on behalf of Sovran LLC (Birinyi, Richard)
Related: [-]