District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00729
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff
MATTHEW JONES
11366 Sussex Highway
Greenwood, DE 19950

GPO Mar 26 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/26/2025. (zsl)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/23 12:04 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5139 for5 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MATTHEW JONES. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re5 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zsl)
Related: [-]
5 5 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 04/21 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to4 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case,3 Memorandum & Opinion by MATTHEW JONES. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Tue 04/01 2:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/26/2025. (zsl)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 04/01 2:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/26/2025. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Wed 03/19 12:39 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmgb)
Related: [-]