Original Case: 1:25-cv-00729

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05139
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Education
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matthew Jones
Represented By
Matthew Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 5:00 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5139
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2112298] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 0383 8007 68] of order [2112296-5]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/23/2025 from Matthew Jones. 25-5139
Related: [-]
6 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112294] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00729-UNA filed by Matthew Jones. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5139 25-5139
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112296] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/12/2025. APPENDIX due 06/12/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-5139
Related: [-]