District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:25-cv-00887
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
KARI LAKE
United States Agency for Global Media 330 Independence Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20237
Defendant
VICTOR MORALES
United States Agency for Global Media 330 Independence Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20237
Defendant
UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
330 Independence Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20237
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ
Voice of America 330 Independence Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20237
Represented By
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J. DOE 1
Represented By
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J. Doe 2
Represented By
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Michael LaBruto
327 16th St. NE
Washington, DC 20002
Represented By
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2025
ORDER denying 32 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2025. (lcrcl3)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Fri 04/25 4:07 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re34 Order on Motion to Stay ; USCA Case Number 25-5145 (znmw)
Related: [-]
34 34 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/25 3:54 PM
ORDER denying32 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response to motion Fri 04/25 10:08 AM
RESPONSE re32 MOTION to Stay re29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 2, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO.(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 motion Stay Thu 04/24 8:21 PM
MOTION to Stay re29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Roman Napoli,
Att: 2 Declaration of Crystal Thomas
31 31 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/24 6:04 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re30 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (znmw)
Related: [-]
30 30 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Thu 04/24 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 8:32 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5145 for30 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, VICTOR MORALES, KARI LAKE. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/22 2:50 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order, and accompanying Memorandum Opinion in Widakuswara v. Lake , 25-cv-1015, for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/22/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 misc Transcript Fri 04/18 4:46 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on April 17, 2025; Page Numbers: 1-118. Date of Issuance: April 18, 2025. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sonja L. Reeves, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/9/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sonja
Thursday, April 17, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 04/17 3:14 PM
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2025 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral arguments heard and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court Reporter: Sonja Reeves. (smc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Stout on behalf of All Defendants (Stout, Abigail)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 04/16 9:58 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re4 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 2, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO. (Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 04/16 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The court will provide access for the public to telephonically attend the hearing scheduled for April 17, 2025, at 11:30 AM. The hearing can be accessed by dialing the Toll-Free Number: 833-990-9400 (Meeting ID: 720718696). It is hereby ORDERED that the attendees using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the following: persons remotely accessing court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting any court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the presiding Judge. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/16/2025. (smc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 order .Order Tue 04/15 5:34 PM
ORDER regarding logistics for the preliminary injunction hearing on Thursday, April 17, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/15/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 04/14 9:57 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re4 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, LaBruto Personal Services Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, J. Doe II Personal Services Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, USAGM Personal Services Contractor Handbook,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, Declaration of Crystal Thomas
Friday, April 11, 2025
23 23 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief Fri 04/11 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMICI FORMER US FOREIGN POLICY AND NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS AND OTHER EXPERTS ON PUBLIC DIPLOMACY.(Cedarbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Amicus Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration,
Att: 5 Declaration,
Att: 6 Declaration,
Att: 7 Declaration
Thursday, April 10, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 04/10 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (In Person) before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (smc)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 7:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: the parties will adhere to the briefing schedule in Widakuswara v. Lake , 25-cv-1015. The government's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is due by 4/14/2025. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 4/16/2025 at 12:00 pm. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15- In Person before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/10/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Wed 04/09 8:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/07 1:07 PM
ORDER: Status Report due by 4/9/2025. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/7/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 04/04 7:48 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 respm Response to motion Wed 04/02 7:54 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition filed by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO, J. DOE 2.(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Abramowitz
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 04/01 1:02 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion for Order filed by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (See docket entry [17 to view document) (zdp) Modified on 4/1/2025; duplicate of docket entry16 (zdp)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stay Tue 04/01 11:13 AM
MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Widakuswara Mem. Op. (ECF No. 54)
16 16 11 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 04/01 11:11 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion for Order filed by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Widakuswara Mem. Op. (ECF No. 54)
Monday, March 31, 2025
15 15 motion Motion For Order Mon 03/31 11:56 AM
MOTION for Order to Set a Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO, J. DOE 2. (Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief Fri 03/28 6:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS.(Brown, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief
13 13 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 03/28 12:59 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re4 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Declaration of Crystal Thomas
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Fri 03/28 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re J. Doe 1 by J. DOE 1 (Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 9:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 03/26 1:25 PM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 11:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Beaton, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11567994. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO, J. DOE 1, J. DOE 2.(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Dotzel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotzel, Margaret)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 03/26 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO, J. DOE 1, J. DOE 2. Case related to Case No. 25-cv-00799. (Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Wed 03/26 8:54 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by J. DOE 2, MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 1, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO re1 Complaint, filed by J. DOE 2, MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 1, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by J. DOE 1, ANTHONY MICHAEL LABRUTO, MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 2.(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/26 2:16 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, Anthony Michael LaBruto, J. DOE 1, J. Doe 2.(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Declaration of Abramowitz,
Att: 6 Declaration of J. Doe 1,
Att: 7 Declaration of J. Doe 2,
Att: 8 Declaration of LaBruto,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction
3 3 motion Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Wed 03/26 1:30 AM
SEALED MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by J. DOE 1, J. Doe 2(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration J. Doe 1 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration J. Doe 2 Declaration,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 03/26 1:09 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to (Schultz, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 12:57 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11566992) filed by J. Doe 2, MICHAEL ABRAMOWITZ, J. DOE 1, Anthony Michael LaBruto.(Schultz, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/26/2025) (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Lake Summons,
Att: 4 Summons Morales Summons,
Att: 5 Summons USAGM Summons,
Att: 6 Summons Bondi Summons,
Att: 7 Summons Martin Summons
notice Notice of Error- New Case Wed 03/26 5:40 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: (1) Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please locate the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form[LINK:here] and file, in a non-fillable PDF format, using the event "Civil Cover Sheet." (2) The related case form lists "RFE/RL, Inc., v. Kari Lake, et al., Case No. 25 Civ. 779 (D.D.C. 2025)" as a related case. The case caption and number do not match. Please file a new related case form correcting this. (zjd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Wed 03/26 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Believing that Plaintiffs John Doe 1 and John Doe 2 have made the required showing on the relevant factors, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'3 Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is GRANTED; and 2) They shall be permitted to proceed pseudonymously unless and until the assigned judge determines otherwise. Given the expedited nature of this matter, the Court determines that a full Opinion is not practical at this time. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/26/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/26 12:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zjd)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/26 5:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Government's Response due by 3/28/2025 at 1:00 pm. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/26/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]