Original Case: 1:25-cv-00887

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05145
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Kari Lake, in her official capacity as Senior Advisor to the Acting CEO of the United States Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Victor Morales, in his official capacity as Acting CEO of the United States Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
U.S. Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael Abramowitz, in his official capacity as Director of Voice of America
Represented By
Margaret Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Anthony Michael Labruto
Represented By
Margaret Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
J. Doe 2
Represented By
Margaret Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 4:28 AM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5145
Related: [-]
12 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112739] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00887-RCL filed by Kari Lake, Victor Morales and U.S. Agency for Global Media. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5145 25-5145
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112742] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/09/2025. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/09/2025 25-5145
Related: [-]