Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10397

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-ap-50456
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Abraham Natural Foods Corp.
30-20 Review Avenue
Long Island City, NY 11101
Represented By
Abraham Natural Foods Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Boxed Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/21 8:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-50456 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 04/17 2:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Boxed Liquidation Trust (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 04/01 7:48 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Abraham Natural Foods Corp.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ward, Stephanie)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 27, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 03/27 1:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50456 BLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12097716, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 03/27 10:51 AM
Adversary case 25-50456 Complaint by Boxed Liquidation Trust against Abraham Natural Foods Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 6/25/2025. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives