Boxed, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10397 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 31, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Boxed, Inc.
61 Broadway 30th Floor
New York, NY 10006 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Boxed Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (multichannelmerchant.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/06/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
542 | 542
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 3:09 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10400 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by UMB Bank, N.A. solely in its capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Boxed Liquidation Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
541 | 541
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 3:07 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10398 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by UMB Bank, N.A. solely in its capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Boxed Liquidation Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
540 | 540
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 3:05 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10401 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by UMB Bank, N.A. solely in its capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Boxed Liquidation Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
539 | 539
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 3:02 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10399 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by UMB Bank, N.A. solely in its capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Boxed Liquidation Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
538 | 538
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 3:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by UMB Bank, N.A. solely in its capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Boxed Liquidation Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |