Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10397

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-ap-50478
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Campbell's Company
One Campbell Place
Camden, NJ 08103
Represented By
The Campbell's Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Boxed Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 04/29 2:55 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by The Campbell's Company. (Tryon, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Add Attorney Tue 04/29 2:57 PM
Attorney Mark R. Owens and Amy Tryon for The Campbell's Company, Amy Tryon and Amy Tryon for The Campbell's Company added to case Filed by The Campbell's Company. (Tryon, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Fri 04/25 12:55 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Boxed Liquidation Trust. Objections due by 5/9/2025. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 04/01 8:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant The Campbell's Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ward, Stephanie)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 27, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 03/27 1:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50478 BLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12097716, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 03/27 11:38 AM
Adversary case 25-50478 Complaint by Boxed Liquidation Trust against The Campbell's Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 6/25/2025. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives