Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10397

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-ap-50484
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Visa, Inc.
900 Metro Center Boulevard
Foster City, CA 94404
Represented By
Visa, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Boxed Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Fri 04/25 12:55 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Boxed Liquidation Trust. Objections due by 5/9/2025. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 04/01 8:32 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Visa, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ward, Stephanie)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 27, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 03/27 1:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50484 BLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12097716, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 03/27 11:52 AM
Adversary case 25-50484 Complaint by Boxed Liquidation Trust against Visa, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 6/25/2025. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives