Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:25-bk-10606
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Leisure Investments Holdings LLC

,
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Allison S Mielke
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Jared W Kochenash
Young Conaway
contact info
Sean T. Greecher
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 8:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kcc Llc Dba Verita Global
contact info
Creditor
Roth & Scholl
866 S. Dixie Highway
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Roth
Roth & Scholl
contact info
Interested Party
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin Whittam
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Blaire A. Cahn
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
John R. Dodd
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Ann M. Kashishian
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Paul J. Keena, Jr.
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
GLAS Americas LLC and GLAS USA LLC
Represented By
Adrienne K. Walker
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Evelyn J. Meltzer
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Miami-Dade County
Miami-Dade County Ileana Cruz 111 N. W. 1st Street, Suite 2810
Miami, FL 33128
Represented By
Ileana M. Cruz
Miami Dade County
contact info
Eric M. Sutty
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Prudential Legacy Insurance Company of New Jersey
Represented By
Kevin Whittam
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Blaire A. Cahn
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Paul J. Keenan, Jr.
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
John R. Dodd
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Ann M. Kashishian
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Kevin Whittam
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Blaire A. Cahn
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Paul J. Keenan, Jr.
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
John R. Dodd
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Ann M. Kashishian
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Eduardo Albor
Represented By
Daniel N. Gonzalez
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
James C Moon
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Other Prof.
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kcc Llc Dba Verita Global
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
130 130 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 10:10 PM
Certificate of Service re Documents Served on April 30, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 105 ,106 ,107 ,108 ,109 ,110 ,111
129 129 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/06 3:27 PM
Notice of Service of Subpoenas to Testify at a Deposition Filed by Eduardo Albor. (Busenkell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
128 128 1 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee Tue 05/06 2:39 PM
Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Hackman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
127 127 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Advance Retainers to Mexican Counsel Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 97
126 126 order Order-Joint Admin Mon 05/05 2:55 PM
Second Order (I) Directing Joint Administration Of Additional Chapter 11 Case, (II) Applying Orders Previously Entered By The Court To The Additional Chapter 11 Case, And (III) Granting Related Relief [An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing that this case be consolidated with the case of Leisure Investments Holdings LLC, Case No. 25-10606 (LSS), and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 25- 10606 (LSS).] Signed on 5/5/2025 (CMB)
Related: [-]
125 125 4 pgs misc Rule 2019 Statement - Attorney Mon 05/05 2:47 PM
Rule 2019 Statement Filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Prudential Legacy Insurance Company of New Jersey, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Cousins, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
124 124 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 05/05 11:37 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Ivan M. Gold Related [+] Order Signed on 5/5/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 120
123 123 1 pgs audio Mon 05/05 11:00 AM
Court Date & Time [05/05/2025 10:00:51 AM]. File Size [ 7726 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:12 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
122 122 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 05/05 9:49 AM
Certification of Counsel Certification of Counsel Submitting Second Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Additional Chapter 11 Case, (II) Applying Orders Previously Entered by the Court to the Additional Chapter 11 Case, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 3 ,32 ,64 ,68
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, May 04, 2025
121 121 misc Certificate of Service Sun 05/04 7:34 PM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Notice of Agenda for Hearing of Matters Scheduled for May 5, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (ET); and 2) Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Compensate Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 113 ,114
Friday, May 02, 2025
120 120 1 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/02 4:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Ivan M. Gold of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP . Receipt Number 4677584, Filed by Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort. (Roglen, Laurel)
Related: [-]
119 119 3 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Fri 05/02 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort. (Roglen, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
118 118 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/02 4:30 PM
Notice of Service // Notice of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition Directed to Eduardo Albor Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Greecher, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
117 117 court Omnibus Hearing Dates Fri 05/02 1:50 PM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:00 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/2/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-]
116 116 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 05/02 1:05 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-]
115 115 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 9:44 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/29/2025 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/31/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/9/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/2/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/31/2025. (BJM)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Fri 05/02 4:47 PM
Attorney Leslie C. Heilman and Laurel D. Roglen for Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort, Margaret A. Vesper and Laurel D. Roglen for Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort, Ivan M Gold and Laurel D. Roglen for Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort added to case Filed by Keys Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Hawks Cay Resort. (Roglen, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
114 114 order Authorize Thu 05/01 3:55 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Compensate Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 59
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1-2
113 113 8 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Thu 05/01 11:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
112 112 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 04/30 5:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Certification of Counsel Regarding Revised Proposed Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Compensate Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 59
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
111 111 order Authorize Wed 04/30 3:37 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Redact Personally Identifiable Information for Certain Individual Creditors and Parties in Interest; and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 60
110 110 2 pgs order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 04/30 3:37 PM
Order Extending Time To File (I) Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities And Statements Of Financial Affairs And (II) Initial 2015.3 Reports Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 58
109 109 6 pgs order Order Approving Motion Regarding Interim Compensation Procedures Wed 04/30 3:36 PM
Order (I) Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses For Retained Professionals And (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 57
108 108 order Employ (Application) Wed 04/30 3:35 PM
Order Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC DBA Verita Global As Administrative Advisor To The Debtors, Effective As Of The Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 56
107 107 order Employ (Application) Wed 04/30 3:33 PM
Order Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP As Counsel To The Debtors, Effective As Of The Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 55
106 106 order Employ (Application) Wed 04/30 3:32 PM
Order (I) Designating Robert Wagstaff Of Riveron Management Services, LLC As The Chief Restructuring Officer; (II) Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Riveron Management Services, LLC And Inversiones Moyano Luca Limitada, To Provide Temporary Staff And Approving The Terms Thereof, Effective As Of The Petition Date; And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 54
105 105 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 3:31 PM
Final Order (I) Authorizing The Debtors To Pay Certain Prepetition Wages, Salaries, And Other Accrued Compensation And Benefits Associated With Their Initial Payroll And (II) Authorizing And Directing Applicable Banks And Other Financial Institutions To Process And Pay All Checks Presented For Payment And To Honor All Funds Transfer Requests Made By The Debtors Relating To The Foregoing Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 52 ,63
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
104 104 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/29 6:13 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Redact Personally Identifiable Information for Certain Individual Creditors and Parties in Interest; and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 60
103 103 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/29 5:56 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 58
102 102 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/29 5:50 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 57
101 101 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 04/29 5:44 PM
Certification of Counsel Certification of Counsel Regarding Revised Proposed Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global as Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 56
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
100 100 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/29 5:34 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Counsel to the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 55
99 99 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 04/29 5:26 PM
Certification of Counsel Certification of Counsel Regarding Revised Proposed Order (I) Designating Robert Wagstaff of Riveron Management Services, LLC as the Chief Restructuring Officer; (II) Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Riveron Management Services, LLC and Inversiones Moyano Luca Limitada, to Provide Temporary Staff and Approving the Terms Thereof, Effective as of the Petition Date; and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 54
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
98 98 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/29 5:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Final Order Regarding Emergency Motion for Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Accrued Compensation and Benefits Associated with their Initial Payroll and (II) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Process and Pay All Checks Presented for Payment and to Honor All Funds Transfer Requests Made by the Debtors Relating to the Foregoing Related [+] Filed by Leisure Investments Holdings LLC. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-] 52 ,63
97 97 order Authorize Tue 04/29 2:45 PM
Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Advance Retainers to Mexican Counsel Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 74
96 96 audio Tue 04/29 12:05 PM
Court Date & Time [04/29/2025 10:01:58 AM]. File Size [ 23185 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:48:54 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
95 95 misc Declaration Tue 04/29 8:54 AM
Declaration Of Alfonso Duenas Barajas (I) In Response To Declaration Of Carlo Braulio Reyes Escandon [Ecf No. 91] And (II) In Support Of Eduardo Albors Verified Response To Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Enforcing (A) The Automatic Stay And (B) The Courts Order Compelling Debtors Former Officers And Other Required Personnel To Turn Over Records And (II) Granting Related Relief [Ecf No. 88] Related [+] Filed by Eduardo Albor. (Busenkell, Michael)
Related: [-] 88 ,91
94 94 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 1:51 AM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Debtors Witness List for Hearing Set for April 29, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time); 2) Declaration of Carlo Braulio Reyes Escandn in Support of Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Enforcing (A) the Automatic Stay and (B) the Courts Order Compelling Debtors Former Officers and Other Required Persons to Turn Over Records, and (II) Granting Related Relief; and 3) Notice of Amended Agenda for Hearing of Matters Scheduled for April 29, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 89 ,91 ,92
93 93 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 1:48 AM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Agenda for Hearing of Matters Scheduled for April 29, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 86