Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10606

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:25-bk-10624
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Dolphin Connection, Inc.
Hawks Cay Resort 61 Hawks Cay Blvd.
Duck Key, FL 33050
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 04/02 2:44 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration Of Related Chapter 11 Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief [An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of the following: Leisure Investments Holdings LLC, Case No. 25-10606 (LSS); Triton Investments Holdings LLC, Case No. 25-10608 (LSS); MS Leisure Company, Case No. 25-10610 (LSS); Icarus Investments Holdings LLC, Case No. 25-10612 (LSS); Ejecutivos de Turismo Sustentable, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 25-10614 (LSS); Dolphin Capital Company, S. de R.L. de C.V., Case No. 25-10615 (LSS); Dolphin Leisure, Inc., Case No. 25-10616 (LSS); Dolphin Austral Holdings, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 25-10617 (LSS); Aqua Tours, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 25-10618 (LSS); Viajero Ciberntico, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 25-10619 (LSS); Promotora Garrafn, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 25-10620 (LSS); Marineland Leisure, Inc., Case No. 25-10621 (LSS); GWMP, LLC, Case No. 25-10622 (LSS); Gulf World Marine Park, Inc., Case No. 25-10623 (LSS); and The Dolphin Connection, Inc., Case No. 25-10624 (LSS). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 25-10606 (LSS)] Signed on 4/2/2025 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 04/01 9:10 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10624 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A12104030, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 03/31 12:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by The Dolphin Connection, Inc.. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 03/31 8:36 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (SH)
Related: [-]