Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03126

Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:25-cv-00035
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:42 AM MDT
Defendant
Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant
Snowflake, Inc.
Defendant
Ticketmaster, LLC
Plaintiff
New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Domenic A. Cossi
Western Justice Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
7 7 motion Leave to File Under Seal - SDM Fri 05/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC, Defendants Lendingtree, LLC, LendingTree, LLC, Lendingtree, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM-JTJ et al. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - SDM Wed 04/23 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union. Snowflake, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed - SDM Wed 04/23 1:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union. Ticketmaster, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed - SDM Wed 04/23 1:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union. Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 utility MDL Notice to Counsel Mon 03/31 9:21 AM
COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Snowflake, Inc., Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 24-3126 Counsel should read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in the master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 2:24-md-3126-BMM. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the[LINK:Snowflake, Inc. Data Breach MDL website page] . Attorneys not admitted to the federal bar for the District of Montana must request pro hac vice e-filing access to the District of Montana CM/ECF system through PACER and then electronically file a motion to proceed pro hac vice in this matter. Once the pro hac vice motion has been granted, counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the master docket. Instructions for submitting an MDL Attorney E-Filing Registration request in PACER can be found[LINK:here] . If you have any questions please contact the MDL docket clerk at 406-727-1922. (ACC)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 9:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Ticketmaster. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (HEG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Live Nation Summons,
Att: 2 Snowflake Summons
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 87 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 03/31 8:35 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against All Defendants, filed by New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union. (HEG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/31 8:37 AM
Filing fee received: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3454274 (HEG)
Related: [-]