District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:25-cv-01015
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:25-cv-02390
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Amicus
REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By
Lin Weeks
Reporters Committee For Freedom Of The Press
contact info
Defendant
KARI LAKE
Defendant
VICTOR MORALES
Defendant
U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
Plaintiff
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES (AFGE)
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Kristin Lee Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin F. Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES (AFSCME)
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Kristin Lee Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin F. Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Georgina C. Yeomans
American Federation Of State, County, And Municipal Employee
contact info
Matthew Stark Blumin
American Federation Of State, County And Municipal Employees
contact info
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMERICAN FOREIGN SERVICE ASSOCIATION (AFSA)
Represented By
Kristin Lee Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin F. Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN DOES 1-4
Represented By
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSICA JERREAT
Represented By
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHRYN NEEPER
Represented By
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
REPORTERS SANS FRONTIERES
Represented By
Andrew G. Celli
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, INC.
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
THE NEWSGUILD-CWA
Represented By
Kristin Lee Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin F. Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PATSY WIDAKUSWARA
Represented By
Nicholas Bourland
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
ORDER: Counsel for the parties are directed to appear for a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order on March 28, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. Any responsive submission on behalf of Defendants shall be filed by March 27, 2025, at 5:00 p.m., notwithstanding the deadline discussed during the March 24, 2025 telephone conference. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 3/27/2025, Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 318, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/24/2025) (vfr)[Transferred from New York Southern on 4/4/2025.]
GPO Mar 28 2025
OPINION AND ORDER For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pending the hearing and determination of Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, Defendants, and those acting in concert with them, are temporarily enjoined from taking any further actions to implement or effectuate the March 14, 2025 Executive Order entitled "Continuing the Reduction of the Federal Bureaucracy" as to USAGM and the March 15, 2025 email issued to all VOA staff, or take any action to reduce USAGM's workforce (whether employees, contractors, or grantees), included but not limited to (i) proceeding with any further attempt to terminate, reduce-in-force, place on leave, or furlough any USAGM employee, or contractor, (ii) terminating (or proceeding with terminating as announced) any USAGM grant or contract or proceeding with terminating any USAGM Personal Services Contractors (PSCs) who received notice after March 14, 2025 that their contract would be terminated, including but not limited to John Doe 3 and John Doe 4 who received notice that their contracts would be terminated on March 31, 2025, or (iii) closing any USAGM office or requiring employees or contractors in overseas offices to return to the United States. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/28/2025) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/4/2025.]
GPO Apr 04 2025
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) is GRANTED. Notwithstanding the transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, the temporary restraining order issued by this Court on March 28, 2025 (ECF No. 54) remains in full force and effect unless and until modified, extended, or vacated by the transferee court. See, e.g., Khalil v. Joyce, ---F. Supp. 3d. ---, No. 25-CV-1935, 2025 WL 849803, at *14 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 19, 2025) (ordering that a stay of removal remain in place until a transferee court modified it); Perficient, Inc. v. Priore, No. 16-CV-249, 2016 WL 866090, at *6 (E.D. Mo. Mar. 7, 2016) ("As this Court has jurisdiction over the defendant, the Temporary Restraining Order remains in full force and effect [after transfer] until its scheduled expiration date."); Valassis Commc'ns, Inc. v. News Corp., No. 13-14654, 2017 WL 4230646, at *5 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 25, 2017) (concurrently entering a preliminary injunction and granting a motion to transfer); Vendavo, Inc. v. Long, 397 F. Supp. 3d 1115, 1148-49 (N.D. Ill. 2019) (same). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Further, the Clerk shall effectuate the transfer of the case immediately, notwithstanding the seven-day period provided for in Local Rule 83.1, which is hereby waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/4/2025) (vfr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/4/2025.]
GPO Apr 22 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A separate Order will follow. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/22/2025. (lcrcl3)
GPO Apr 25 2025
ORDER denying 102 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2025. (lcrcl3)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
106 106 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 10:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Status Reports in Related Cases by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
105 105 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Fri 04/25 4:05 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re104 Order on Motion to Stay; USCA Case Number 25-5144 (znmw)
Related: [-]
104 104 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/25 3:53 PM
ORDER denying102 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
103 103 motion Briefing Schedule Fri 04/25 10:39 AM
MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Expedited Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES (AFGE), AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES (AFSCME), AMERICAN FOREIGN SERVICE ASSOCIATION (AFSA), JOHN DOES 1-4, JESSICA JERREAT, KATHRYN NEEPER, NEWSGUILD-CWA, REPORTERS SANS FRONTIERES, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, INC., PATSY WIDAKUSWARA. (Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Fri 04/25 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER finding as moot103 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The Court has denied the defendants' Motion to Stay. See ECF No. 102. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2025. (lcrcl3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
102 102 motion Stay Thu 04/24 8:24 PM
MOTION to Stay re99 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Roman Napoli,
Att: 2 Declaration of Crystal Thomas
101 101 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/24 6:03 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re100 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (znmw)
Related: [-]
100 100 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Thu 04/24 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to99 Order by KARI LAKE, VICTOR MORALES, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 8:32 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5144 for100 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, VICTOR MORALES, KARI LAKE. (znmw)
Related: [-]