Original Case: 1:25-cv-01015

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05144
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Kari Lake, in her official capacity as Senior Advisor to the Acting CEO of the U.S. Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Victor Morales, in his official capacity as Acting CEO of the U.S. Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
U.S. Agency for Global Media
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Patsy Widakuswara
Represented By
David A. Schulz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jessica Jerreat
Represented By
David A. Schulz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kathryn Neeper
Represented By
David A. Schulz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Does 1-4
Represented By
David A. Schulz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Reporters Sans Frontieres
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Reporters Without Borders, Inc.
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, (AFSCME)
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Kristin Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
American Federation of Government Employees, (AFGE)
Represented By
Norman Larry Eisen
Norman Eisen PLLC
contact info
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Kristin Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
American Foreign Service Association, (AFSA)
Represented By
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Kristin Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NewsGuild-Communications Workers of America
Represented By
Daniel M. Eisenberg
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Kristin Bateman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 4:28 AM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5144
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112736] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-01015-RCL filed by Kari Lake, Victor Morales and U.S. Agency for Global Media. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5144 25-5144
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112741] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/09/2025. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/09/2025. 25-5144
Related: [-]