Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:25-bk-10687
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Deqser LLC
1 Eastern Road
Kearny, NJ 07032
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Sandra E. Mayerson
Mayerson & Hartheimer, PLLC
contact info
David Hartheimer
Mayerson & Hartheimer, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 4:26 PM EDT
Creditor
CSV Capital Partners LLC
Represented By
Jason S. Levin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Eastern Funding LLC
Represented By
Joseph M. DiOrio
Pannone Lopes Devereaux & Ogara LLC
contact info
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
KPIP Urban Renewal II LLC
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Daniel A. Bloom
Riker Danzig LLP
contact info
Ashly Riches
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Joseph L. Schwartz
Riker Danzig LLP
contact info
Tara J. Schellhorn
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti
contact info
Interested Party
Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc.
Represented By
Chelsea A Botsch
Mccarter & English
contact info
Will R Tansey
Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.
contact info
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David L. Hashmall
Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH
Represented By
Chelsea A Botsch
Mccarter & English
contact info
Will R Tansey
Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.
contact info
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David L. Hashmall
Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Merchant Financial Corporation
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Katherine Welch
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Sheryl P. Giugliano
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Michael S. Amato
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Jonathan Lipshie
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
55 55 1 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee Wed 04/30 9:27 AM
Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Lipshie, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
54 54 1 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/29 5:38 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Will R. Tansey, Esquire . Receipt Number 4673969, Filed by Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc., Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
53 53 1 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/29 5:36 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for David L. Hashmall, Esquire . Receipt Number 4673969, Filed by Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc., Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
52 52 1 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Sun 04/27 12:14 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by North Shore Linen, Inc.. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
51 51 3 pgs notice Hearing - Notice Fri 04/25 4:16 PM
Notice of Hearing With Respect To Final Approval of Debtors' Motion For Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing The Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, (III) Granting Adequate Protection To Certain Prepetition Secured Credit Parties, (IV) Modifying The Automatic Stay, (V) Authorizing The Debtors to Enter Into Agreements With CSV Capital LLC, (VI) Authorizing Non-Consensual Use of Cash Collateral, (VII) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VIII) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Deqser LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/5/2025. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 15 ,50
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
50 50 41 pgs order Debtor In Posession Financing Fri 04/25 4:05 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Credit Parties, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (V) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into Agreements with CSV Capital Partners LLC, (VI) Authorizing Non-Consensual Use of Cash Collateral, (VII) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VIII) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 4/25/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 31 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 2 pgs Schedule 1
49 49 3 pgs misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 04/25 3:49 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion For Entry Of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing The Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Credit Parties, (IV) Modifying The Automatic Stay, (V) Authorizing The Debtors To Enter Into Agreements With CSV Capital LLC, (VI) Authorizing Non-Consensual Use Of Cash Collateral, (VII) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VIII) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Deqser LLC. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 75 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 50 pgs Exhibit B
48 48 notice Hearing - Notice Fri 04/25 1:09 PM
Omnibus Notice of Hearing With Respect to Final Approval of Certain First Day Motions Related [+] Filed by Deqser LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/5/2025. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 7 ,9 ,11 ,12 ,14 ,39 ,40 ,41 ,42 ,43
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
47 47 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 04/25 11:33 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Sheryl P. Giugliano Related [+] Signed on 4/25/2025. (NAB)
Related: [-] 37
46 46 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 04/25 10:18 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Michael S. Amato Related [+] Signed on 4/25/2025. (NAB)
Related: [-] 36
Thursday, April 24, 2025
45 45 2 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Thu 04/24 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH, Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc.. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
44 44 7 pgs motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion Thu 04/24 3:07 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Deqser LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/5/2025. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
43 43 order Motion to Pay Employee Wages Thu 04/24 2:08 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Certain Employee Compensation and Benefits, (B) Maintain and Continue Such Benefits and Other Employee-Related Programs and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 4/24/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 14
42 42 order Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Thu 04/24 2:06 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 4/24/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 12
41 41 order Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Thu 04/24 2:05 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Payment of Prepetition Sales, Use, Property and Similar Taxes and Fees and (II) Authorizing Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Issued and Electronic Payment Requests Made Relating to the Foregoing Related [+]. Signed on 4/24/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 11
40 40 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 04/24 2:03 PM
Interim Order Authorizing KNY 26671 LLC to (I) Maintain Existing Insurance Policies and Pay All Insurance Obligations Arising Thereunder, and (II) to Renew, Revise, Extend, Supplement, Change or Enter into New Insurance Policies Related [+]. Signed on 4/24/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 9
39 39 order Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Thu 04/24 1:58 PM
Interim Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Discontinuing, Altering, or Refusing Service, (II) Deeming Utility Companies to Have Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedures For Resolving Requests For Additional Assurance Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 366 Related [+]. Signed on 4/24/2025. (DCY)
Related: [-] 7
38 38 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 04/24 11:48 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Certain First Day Motions Related [+] Filed by Deqser LLC. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 7 ,9 ,11 ,12 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit A-J
misc Add Attorney Thu 04/24 4:01 PM
Attorney Chelsea A Botsch and Kate R. Buck for Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc. and Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH, Will R Tansey and Kate R. Buck for Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc. and Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH, David L. Hashmall and Kate R. Buck for Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc. and Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH added to case Filed by Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc., Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
37 37 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 04/23 1:13 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Sheryl P. Giugliano, Esquire . Receipt Number 163906, Filed by Merchant Financial Corporation. (Leonhardt, Scott)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 04/23 1:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Amato, Esquire . Receipt Number 163906, Filed by Merchant Financial Corporation. (Leonhardt, Scott)
Related: [-]