Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10687

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:25-bk-10688
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
KNY 26671 LLC, Debtor
1 Eastern Rd
Kearny, NJ 07032-6524
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Debtor
KNY 26671 LLC
1 Eastern Road
Kearny, NJ 07032
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
Interested Party
Eastern Funding LLC
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Joseph M. DiOrio
Pannone Lopes Devereaux & Ogara LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
7 7 notice Appearance - Notice Sun 04/27 12:17 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by North Shore Linen, Inc.. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 order Motion for Joint Administration Mon 04/21 11:45 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Deqser LLC and KNY 26671 LLC. All further filings and docket entries shall be made in the chapter 11 case of Deqser LLC, Case No. 25-10687 (CTG) Related [+] Signed on 4/21/2025. (NAB)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 2 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Wed 04/16 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH, Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc.. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Wed 04/16 11:37 AM
Attorney Will R Tansey and Kate R. Buck for Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH and Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc., David L. Hashmall and Kate R. Buck for Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH and Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc. added to case Filed by Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH, Kannegiesser ETECH, Inc.. (Buck, Kate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 8 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion Tue 04/15 12:56 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Motion For an Order Directing Joint Administration of The Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Filed By KNY 26671 LLC(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 2 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Fri 04/11 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Eastern Funding LLC. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 04/11 8:09 AM
Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 04/10 9:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10688 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A12121753, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/10 9:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by KNY 26671 LLC. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]