Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03121
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:24-cv-10818
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 8:47 PM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Lanser
Represented By
Jennifer R Scullion
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Christopher A Seeger
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Christopher L Ayers
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 2:53 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
36 36 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Wed 04/16 9:48 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/16 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Tue 04/15 5:35 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New Jersey
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/16 10:02 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE MDL 3144 held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon. (aco)
Related: [-]
32 32 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Central District of California. (krg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Case extracted via ECF to the Central District of California. (krg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
37 37 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/16 9:59 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. This Court has been assigned to handle the In re: TikTok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, MDL No. 3144. See U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case MDL No. 3144, Dkt. No. 83. Pursuant thereto, the following cases have been transferred to the undersigned judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Given the need to process this litigation expeditiously, an initial status conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on April 14, 2025, at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA, 90012, Courtroom 9D, 9th Floor. Pursuant thereto, all pending motions in the above cases are taken off-calendar with their reinstatement to be discussed at the status conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Wed 04/16 9:45 AM
Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/3/2025 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:24-cv-10818-SDW-AME from District of New Jersey (Newark). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-3144-GW (RAOx). (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Powers . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
31 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Powers by BYTEDANCE LTD., BYTEDANCE, INC., TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(4),
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffrey A.N. Kopczynski in Support,
Att: 3 Declaration of Matthew D. Powers in Support,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
30 30 ORDER granting29 Motion to Withdraw Stephen J. McIntyre as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/3/2025. (ld) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Stephen J. McIntyre . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
29 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Stephen J. McIntyre by BYTEDANCE LTD., BYTEDANCE, INC., TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
28 28 RESPONSE re27 Notice (Other),. (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
27 27 NOTICE by KATHLEEN LANSER re25 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,24 Cross MOTION to Stay re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California of Supplemental Authority(SCULLION, JENNIFER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California REFERRED to Andre M. Espinosa. (cds) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
26 26 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California and re 24 Cross MOTION to Stay (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
Set Deadlines as to24 Cross MOTION to Stay re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
25 25 8 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by KATHLEEN LANSER re24 Cross MOTION to Stay re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California (SCULLION, JENNIFER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer Scullion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
24 24 Cross MOTION to Stay re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California by KATHLEEN LANSER.(SCULLION, JENNIFER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
23 23 ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/21/2025. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave for Stephen D. Brody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/21/2025. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave for Daniel M. Petrocelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/21/2025. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
20 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Defendants' time for responding to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to the later of 30 days after: (1) this Court's decision on Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 16) or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on the pending Motion to Centralize in In re TikTok Inc. Minor Privacy Litigation, MDL No. 3144 (J.P.M.L.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/8/2025. (ld) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 STIPULATION re1 Complaint / to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of KATHLEEN LANSER (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen J. McIntyre ,13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Petrocelli ,14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Brody . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California . Motion reset for 2/3/2025 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
17 17 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by KATHLEEN LANSER re16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California (SCULLION, JENNIFER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to Central District of California,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brian O'Connor in support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen J. McIntyre by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(4),
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Brody by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(4),
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Declaration of Stephen D. Brody in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Petrocelli by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.(KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(4),
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffrey A.N. Kopczynski in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC identifying ByteDance Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A.N. KOPCZYNSKI on behalf of BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. TIKTOK PTE. LTD waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. TIKTOK LTD waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. TIKTOK INC waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. BYTEDANCE LTD. waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LANSER. BYTEDANCE, INC. waiver sent on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BYTEDANCE LTD., BYTEDANCE, INC., TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK PTE. LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS on behalf of KATHLEEN LANSER (AYERS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R. SCULLION on behalf of KATHLEEN LANSER (SCULLION, JENNIFER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 30, 2024
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15839763), filed by KATHLEEN LANSER.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet