California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-ml-03144
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
19 19 motion Order Wed 04/30 5:20 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Suspension and Clarification of Preservation Order filed by Defendants Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd, TikTok Inc, TikTok Ltd, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.. (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Bytedance Ltd(pty:dft)) (Petrocelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli In Support of Defendants Opposed Ex Parte Application,
Att: 2 Declaration of Noreen Yeh In Support of Defendants Opposed Ex Parte Application,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Opposed Ex Parte
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 04/29 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/28/2025 re Transcript17 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Hourigan, Terri)
Related: [-]
17 17 transcript -Transcript Tue 04/29 5:23 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/28/2025 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Terri Hourigan, phone number hourigan.terri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/20/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Hourigan, Terri)
Related: [-]
16 16 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Tue 04/29 10:21 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd, TikTok Inc, TikTok Ltd, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Hana Stodder at hstodder@omm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Powers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Tue 04/29 9:23 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Heather Bresette, Alexis Douglas, Angela Faucett, Valerie Gates, Ryan Hoyt, Kayla Jaramillo, Darryl Maultsby, Marcelo Muto, Lamartine Pierre, Jr., Jody Villanueva for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sam Roth at sroth@cohenmilstein.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kafka, Eric)
Related: [-]
14 14 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Tue 04/29 9:21 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Heather Bresette, Alexis Douglas, Angela Faucett, Valerie Gates, Ryan Hoyt, Kayla Jaramillo, Darryl Maultsby, Marcelo Muto, Lamartine Pierre, Jr., Jody Villanueva for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sam Roth at sroth@cohenmilstein.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kafka, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 textonly Text Only Notice of Deficiency re Request for Transcript Tue 04/29 8:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120),12 . The following error(s) were found: The G120 ORDER FORM HAD TWO HEARING DATES WITH TWO DIFFERENT COURT REPORTERS. You must electronically refile the above-referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ss)
Related: [-]
12 12 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Mon 04/28 4:44 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Heather Bresette, Alexis Douglas, Angela Faucett, Valerie Gates, Ryan Hoyt, Kayla Jaramillo, Darryl Maultsby, Marcelo Muto, Lamartine Pierre, Jr., Jody Villanueva for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sam Roth at sroth@cohenmilstein.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kafka, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 2:41 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu. All parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. Court and counsel confer re leadership structure. All motions relating to the leadership structure will be filed by May 12, 2025 and will not exceed 20 pages. Responses to the motions will be filed by May 22, 2025 and will not exceed five pages. The Court sets a hearing on the motions for May 29, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The matter will be stayed pending resolution of the leadership structure ruling. (See document for further details). Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 04/24 12:01 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs A. A., A.H., Ryan Armbruster, A. B., Yolanda Berry, A. C., Angela Faucett, H.T., Amanda Hinkle, Scott Humbert, Kathleen Lanser, Tonia Lightwine, Katrice Lindsey, Michael Luong, Chantell Martin, Nick McKissick, Christina Middleton, Lamartine Pierre, Jr., R.W., Jonathan Riley, Monroe Seigle, Jody Villanueva, Katherine R. Walters, Jacquelyn Williams, Consol Plaintiffs Heather Bresette, Alexis Douglas, Angela Faucett, Valerie Gates, Ryan Hoyt, Kayla Jaramillo, Darryl Maultsby, Marcelo Muto, Lamartine Pierre, Jody Villanueva, Intervenor Plaintiffs E. H., J. H., B. L., A. M., M. S., In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation. (Grombacher, Kiley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Wed 04/23 10:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd, TikTok Inc, TikTok Ltd, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Abby Formella at aformella@omm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Powers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/23 9:27 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear in-person or telephonically at the STATUS CONFERENCE set for Monday, April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Tue 04/22 4:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to PLAINTIFF Nick McKissick for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kiley Grombacher at kgrombacher@bradleygrombacher.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Grombacher, Kiley)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 transfer MDL - Order Wed 04/23 8:18 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 transfer MDL - Order Fri 04/18 11:14 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 transfer MDL - Order Fri 04/18 11:13 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 2:02 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 3:13 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. This Court has been assigned to handle the In re: TikTok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, MDL No. 3144. See U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case MDL No. 3144, Dkt. No. 83. Pursuant thereto, the following cases have been transferred to the undersigned judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Given the need to process this litigation expeditiously, an initial status conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on April 14, 2025, at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA, 90012, Courtroom 9D, 9th Floor. Pursuant thereto, all pending motions in the above cases are taken off-calendar with their reinstatement to be discussed at the status conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 4 pgs mdlcmp Order from MDL creating Master Docket (Case Opening) Thu 04/10 10:25 AM
TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:25-ml-03144-GW (RAOx), In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation. Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for Discovery. (et)
Related: [-]