Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-18793

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:25-ap-01153
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC
1782 O'Rourke Blvd.
Gaylord, MI 49735
Represented By
Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin A. Stanziale, Jr.
Stanziale & Stanziale 2839 Route 10, Suite 102
Morris Plains, NJ 07950
Represented By
Mitchell Malzberg
Law Offices Of Mitchell J. Malzberg, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/16 10:28 AM
Summons Issued to Benjamin A. Stanziale, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee for Service on Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC Answer due on 5/16/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 3:46 PM
Adversary case 25-01153 Complaint by Benjamin A. Stanziale Jr. against Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Malzberg, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons