New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:22-bk-18793
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Mar 27, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Wildflower Group LLC, Debtor
1422 Grand St Ste 4D
Hoboken, NJ 07030-2376
Represented By
Jay L. Lubetkin
Rabinowitz Lubetkin & Tully, L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 11/03/2022 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, November 04, 2022
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 11/04 3:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-18793 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44575453, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 83 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 11/04 3:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Jay L. Lubetkin on behalf of The Wildflower Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 02/2/2023. (Lubetkin, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tax Return
Att: 2 Balance Sheet
Att: 3 Income Statement
Att: 4 Statement of Cash Flow