Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-18793

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:25-ap-01155
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
M&T Bank Corporation
One M&T Plaza 8th Floor
Buffalo, NY 14203
Represented By
M&T Bank Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin A. Stanziale, Jr.
Stanziale & Stanziale 2839 Route 10, Suite 102
Morris Plains, NJ 07950
Represented By
Mitchell Malzberg
Law Offices Of Mitchell J. Malzberg, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Mitchell Malzberg on behalf of Benjamin A. Stanziale Jr.. (Malzberg, Mitchell)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-01155 Complaint by Benjamin A. Stanziale Jr. against M&T Bank Corporation. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Attachments: # 1 Summons) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin A. Stanziale
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/16 10:42 AM
Summons Issued to Benjamin A. Stanziale, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee for Service on M&T Bank Corporation Answer due on 5/16/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 3:56 PM
Adversary case 25-01155 Complaint by Benjamin A. Stanziale Jr. against M&T Bank Corporation. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Malzberg, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons