Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-12359

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-ap-01084
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
AMBU INC.
Represented By
AMBU INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard M Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee
Represented By
Mark S Horoupian
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice Tue 05/13 10:53 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint to (1) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 544, 547, 548, 550 and (2) Disallow Claims Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 502 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg Related [+]. (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:25-ap-01084. Complaint by Howard M Ehrenberg against AMBU INC.. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/24 12:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on AMBU INC. 4/22/2025 (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 2:47 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other: Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Mandatory proof of service not attached to PDF - Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 3 Notice filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
3 3 notice Notice Wed 04/23 10:58 AM
Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/16 3:38 PM
Summons Issued on AMBU INC. Date Issued 4/16/2025, Answer Due 5/16/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (SF)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 10:12 AM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-01084. Complaint by Howard M Ehrenberg against AMBU INC.. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]