California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:23-bk-12359
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2023

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Beverly Community Hospital Association, dba Beverly Hospital
309 West Beverly Blvd.
Montebello, CA 90640
Represented By
Jennifer L Nassiri
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

GPO May 02 2024
Order Approving Stipulation Resolving United States Trustee's Potential Objection to First Interim Application of Sills Cummis & Gross, P.C., as Co-counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Allowance and Payment of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period May 15, 2023, Through July 31, 2023 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 1011) Signed on 5/2/2024 (TM)

Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
1467 1467 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 05/12 2:00 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation With The United Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals Further Amending Briefing on Dispute Regarding PTO Obligations (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2025 (SC2)
Related: [-] 1464
Friday, May 09, 2025
1466 1466 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Fri 05/09 4:07 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Current hearing information not included on PDF - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 1464 Stipulation filed by Interested Party White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial
1465 1465 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 05/09 3:48 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Interested Party White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial Related [+]. (Mester, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1464 Stipulation By White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial and The United Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals Further Amending Briefing on Dispute Regarding PTO Obligations Filed by Interested Party White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial
1464 1464 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 05/09 3:36 PM
Stipulation By White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial and The United Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals Further Amending Briefing on Dispute Regarding PTO Obligations Filed by Interested Party White Memorial Medical Center d/b/a Adventist Health White Memorial (Mester, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1463 1463 notice Notice Wed 05/07 2:19 PM
Notice Request to be Removed From Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Other Professional Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Cohen, Leslie)
Related: [-]
1462 1462 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 05/07 12:13 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Trustee Howard M Ehrenberg (TR). (Ehrenberg (TR), Howard)
Related: [-]