Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-12359

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-ap-01096
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By
BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard M Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee
Represented By
Mark S Horoupian
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/01 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/29 2:34 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/29/2025 (SC2)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 04/24 4:55 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg Related [+]. (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (with Proof of Service)
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 04/24 2:39 PM
Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/24 12:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION 4/22/2025 (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 3:00 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other: Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Mandatory proof of service not attached to PDF - Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 3 Notice filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
3 3 notice Notice Wed 04/23 11:39 AM
Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/16 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION Date Issued 4/16/2025, Answer Due 5/16/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (SF)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 11:04 AM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-01096. Complaint by Howard M Ehrenberg against BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]