Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-12359

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-ap-01127
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.
Represented By
INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard M Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee
Represented By
Mark S Horoupian
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
Trustee
Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
1875 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/02 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Application for fees (Rule 2016) ORDER thereon (Ch 13)(BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/01 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 order Application for fees (Rule 2016) ORDER thereon (Ch 13) (BNC-PDF) Wed 04/30 12:43 PM
Order on application of non-resident attorney to apper pro hac vice; ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED "for additional information refer to image" (Ch 13) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/30/2025 (TJ)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 04/29 4:20 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Only filing attorneys' name should be reflected on caption page of PDF - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 12 Withdrawal re: filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.,13 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.
15 15 motion Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion) Tue 04/29 3:56 PM
Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule Filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC. (Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/29 3:14 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/29/2025 (SC2)
Related: [-] 6
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Craig S Ganz Filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.. (Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Withdrawal re: Tue 04/29 2:34 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice of Appearance and Applicaiton of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in a Specific Bankruptcy Case and/or Adversary Case Proceedings Filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC. Related [+]. (Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-] 8 Notice,9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice / Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in a Specific Bankruptcy Case and/or Adversary Proceedings
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/28 4:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. Only filing attorneys 'name should be reflected on caption page of PDF - THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL USING WITHDRAWAL DOCKET EVENT AND REFILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT THAT MATCHES THE DOCUMENT. Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.
10 10 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/28 4:25 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. Only filing attorneys' name should be reflected on caption page of PDF THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL USING WITHDRAWAL DOCKET EVENT AND REFILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT THAT MATCHES THE DOCUMENT. Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 8 Notice filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Mon 04/28 3:54 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice / Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in a Specific Bankruptcy Case and/or Adversary Proceedings Filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC. (Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Mon 04/28 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Filed by Defendant INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.. (Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 04/25 12:20 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg Related [+]. (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 04/25 12:16 PM
Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/24 3:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC. 4/22/2025 (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 4:12 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other: Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Mandatory proof of service not attached to PDF - Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 3 Notice filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
3 3 notice Notice Wed 04/23 12:38 PM
Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/17 10:29 AM
Summons Issued on INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC. Date Issued 4/17/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/24/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (SC2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 1:39 PM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-01127. Complaint by Howard M Ehrenberg against INSIGHT DIRECT USA INC.. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]