Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-12359

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-ap-01152
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC.
Represented By
QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard M Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee
Represented By
Mark S Horoupian
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
Trustee
Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
1875 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 05/10 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 05/08 11:54 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/8/2025 (SC2)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 05/07 11:29 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg Related [+]. (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 05/07 11:20 AM
Stipulation By Howard M Ehrenberg and Defendant to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg (Malmed, Shantal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/24 4:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC. 4/22/2025 (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 3:16 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other: Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Mandatory proof of service not attached to PDF - Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 3 Notice filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
3 3 notice Notice Wed 04/23 2:11 PM
Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/17 12:27 PM
Summons Issued on QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC. Date Issued 4/17/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/22/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (TJ)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard M Ehrenberg
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 3:29 PM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-01152. Complaint by Howard M Ehrenberg against QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC.. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]