Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03118
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:24-cv-08051
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen McIntyre
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M.
Represented By
Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 2:55 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
36 36 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Thu 04/17 4:55 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/17 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
33 33 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Thu 04/17 4:23 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/18 8:14 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE MDL 3144 held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
37 37 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 04/18 8:11 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. This Court has been assigned to handle the In re: TikTok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, MDL No. 3144. See U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case MDL No. 3144, Dkt. No. 83. Pursuant thereto, the following cases have been transferred to the undersigned judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Given the need to process this litigation expeditiously, an initial status conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on April 14, 2025, at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA, 90012, Courtroom 9D, 9th Floor. Pursuant thereto, all pending motions in the above cases are taken off-calendar with their reinstatement to be discussed at the status conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
32 32 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Central District of California.Signed by the MDL Panel on 4/3/2025. (anj, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Central District of California as case 2:25-CV-03118-GW-RAO. (anj, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Thu 04/17 4:50 PM
Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/3/2025 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:24-cv-08051-PD from Northern District of California (San Francisco). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-3144-GW (RAOx). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
31 31 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 29 Motion to Relate Case. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
30 30 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 25-cv-02097-RFL. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 3/10/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
29 29 Joint Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 3/4/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
28 28 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel: Attorney Matthew David Powers substituted for Stephen Joel McIntyre on behalf of ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. (Powers, Matthew) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
27 27 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/12/2025. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re 3:25-cv-01304-LJC. Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 2/7/2025. (bns, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
25 25 ORDER: The case is stayed and all hearings are vacated pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, and the parties are directed to file a joint statement when that decision is made. Defendants' request for an extension of time, Dkt. No. 20, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JD immediately after the case number. Re: 22 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M., 24 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M., 21 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem Declaration in Support of Nick Mckissisck Petition and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M., 23 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M. (anj, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
24 24 Request for Judicial Notice re22 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M.. Related [+] (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 1/14/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-] 22
23 23 DECLARATION of Kiley L. Grombacher in Opposition to22 Opposition/Response to Motion to Transfer by Defendant filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M.. Related [+] (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 1/14/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C- Deft Administrative Motion re Related Cases,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D- Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E Letter dated 12-20-24
22 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M.. (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 1/14/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Transfer Case; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer
21 21 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem Declaration in Support of Nick Mckissisck Petition and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M..(Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 1/14/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Petition for Guardian ad Litem
Thursday, January 09, 2025
20 20 Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 re1 Complaint, filed by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC..(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 1/9/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
19 19 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2025. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/2/2025. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Transfer Case; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
17 17 Renotice motion hearing re14 MOTION to Transfer Case; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer filed byByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.. Related [+] (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
15 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
14 14 MOTION to Transfer Case; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.. Responses due by 1/10/2025. Replies due by 1/17/2025.(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 12/30/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brian O'Connor in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer
13 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC... (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok Ltd. for TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd.; Corporate Parent TikTok Inc. for TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance, Inc, TikTok Ltd.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20181347.) filed by ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC.. (Brody, Stephen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Stephen Joel McIntyre on behalf of ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. (McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of ByteDance, Inc, ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
8 8 NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M.. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF)[Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Ltd., ByteDance, Inc, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC., TikTok Inc., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Pte. Ltd. (cjl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kxo, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
4 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M. (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 11/19/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Electronic Filing Error. No Divisional Assignment selected on Civil Cover Sheet. If case is in connection to an MDL case, please indicate case number in section VIII- Related cases, if any. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover only. Re:3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by NIck McKissick, on Behalf of A.M. (kxo, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY4 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** Civil Cover Sheet by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M. (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 11/18/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Grombacher, Kiley) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against ByteDance Ltd., ByteDance, Inc, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC., TikTok Inc., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Pte. Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20056198.). Filed by Nick McKissick, on Behalf of A.M. (Grombacher, Kiley) Modified on 11/18/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]