Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03338
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 5:25-cv-02239
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok LLC
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Armbruster
Represented By
Francis J Flynn, Jr
Law Office Of Francis J. Flynn Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yolanda Berry
Represented By
Francis J Flynn, Jr
Law Office Of Francis J. Flynn Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
35 35 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 2:52 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
34 34 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/18 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
31 31 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/18 9:54 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for April 28, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
30 30 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Thu 04/17 5:39 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
32 32 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Fri 04/18 10:04 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/14/25 regarding transfer of Case No. 5:25-cv-02239-EKL from U.S. District Court California Northern District (San Jose). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-03144-GW (RAOx). (car)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order Thu 04/17 11:00 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-1) by the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, MDL No. 3144. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Transferring case electronically to the Central District of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
28 28 In light of the transfer order entered in In re: TikTok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation , MDL No. 3144, Dkt. No. 88, the Court vacates the stay 27 issued on 4/14/2025. The Court terminates Defendant's pending 25 motion to transfer the case to the Central District of California. This is done without prejudice to re-noticing the motion after the conclusion of the MDL proceedings. Entered by Judge Eumi K. Lee on April 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ekllc3, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/15/2025 (lrt, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
27 27 This case is hereby STAYED pending a ruling on the motion to create Multi-District Litigation that includes this case, heard on March 27, 2025. The parties shall file an administrative motion to lift the stay within 7 days of the issuance of the order concerning the Multi-District Litigation, attaching a copy of the order. See Civ. L.R. 7-11. Entered by Judge Eumi K. Lee on April 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ekllc3, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byRyan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry.(Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Transfer Case
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Steven A. Schwartz in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer and Exhibits Related Thereto,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Transfer
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 4/9/2025. Replies due by 4/16/2025.(Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian O'Connor in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
24 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Brody. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee. (lrt, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
23 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok Ltd. for TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance Inc., TikTok Ltd.; Corporate Parent TikTok Inc. for TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for TikTok Inc.. and Certificate of Interested Entities (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
22 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20493300.) filed by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. (Brody, Stephen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew David Powers on behalf of ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok LLC waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by ByteDance Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
15 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
14 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK PTE. LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK LLC on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK INC. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BYTEDANCE LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bytedance Inc. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 NOTICE by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry of Related Actions and Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rules 3-12 and 3-13(Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: US v. ByteDance (CD Cal),
Att: 2 Exhibit B: A.A. v ByteDance,
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Villanueva-AA Corrected Consolidated Class Action Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D: S.J. v. ByteDance.pdf (CD Cal),
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Humbert v. ByteDance Compl,
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Walters v. ByteDance.pdf (D. Minnesota),
Att: 7 Exhibit G: Middleton v. ByteDance Compl,
Att: 8 Exhibit H: Lanser v. ByteDance Compl,
Att: 9 Exhibit I: R.W. v. ByteDance
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/16/2025 at 5:00PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sfb, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry.. (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Eumi K Lee. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case, except for discovery purposes. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry (Flynn, Francis) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Jury Trial Demanded against ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20418004.). Filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster.(Flynn, Francis) Modified on 3/5/2025 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet