Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03396
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 4:25-cv-00112
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Hannah Eleanor Murphy
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Glenn T Burhans, Jr
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATRICE LINDSEY
Represented By
Charles Philip Hall
Phil Hall PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 2:47 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/21 11:24 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for April 28, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
26 26 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Fri 04/18 5:16 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/18 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
23 23 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Fri 04/18 4:38 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Northern
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Fri 04/18 5:10 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/14/25 regarding transfer of Case No. 4:25-cv-00112-MW-MAF from U.S. District Court Northern District of Florida (Tallahassee). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-03144-GW (RAOx). (car)
Related: [-]
21 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/1/2025 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/2/2025 . Discovery due by 8/15/2025 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/5/2025 . Status Report due by 5/16/2025 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2025. (baf) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: Set Deadlines/Hearings: ADMISSIONS DUE ATTORNEY MATTHEW D. POWERS by 4/14/2025. (rcb)**ATTORNEY MATTHEW D. POWERS NOT COMPLETED by 4/14/2025**. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 order Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order Fri 04/18 7:45 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). Signed by Clerk of the Panel JAMES V. INGOLD on 4/14/2025. MDL No. 2:25ml3144-GW/RAO. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
20 20 ORDER DENYING 16 MOTION TO TRANSFER. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendants motion to transfer. ECF No. 16 . For the reasons outlined in this Court's Order denying motion to transfer without prejudice in a related case, ECF No. 33 in Humbert et al. v. Bytedance, Inc., et al., Case No.: 5:24-cv-00236-MW/MJF the motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/2/2025. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. The clerk must reassign this case to Chief Judge Walker. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE no longer assigned to case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/2/2025. (rcb) **PLEASE USE THE NEW JUDGE'S INITIALS IN 4:25cv112 MW-MAF** [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:19 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 NOTICE of Related Actions by BYTEDANCE INC, BYTEDANCE LTD, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC (PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadline- Attorney Admissions due for ATTORNEY MATTHEW D. POWERS by 4/14/2025 . (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 ORDER RE: 11 & 12 . Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motions for leave to appear prohac vice, ECF No. 11 - 12 , are GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/27/2025. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:13 Notice of Appearance-GLENN T BURHANS, JR,14 Notice of Appearance -HANNAH ELEANOR MURPHY. (rcb)**AN ISO IS NEEDED** [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re:11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Petrocelli.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9415257.),12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen D. Brody.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9415323.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California by BYTEDANCE INC, BYTEDANCE LTD, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/8/2025) . (BURHANS, GLENN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brian O'Connor ISO Motion to Transfer
15 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BYTEDANCE INC, BYTEDANCE LTD, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC identifying Corporate Parent TIKTOK INC for TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC; Corporate Parent BYTEDANCE LTD for BYTEDANCE INC; Corporate Parent TIKTOK LTD for TIKTOK PTE LTD; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for TIKTOK INC; Corporate Parent BYTEDANCE LTD. for TIKTOK LTD.. (BURHANS, GLENN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by HANNAH ELEANOR MURPHY on behalf of All Defendants (MURPHY, HANNAH) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T BURHANS, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BURHANS, GLENN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen D. Brody.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9415323.) by BYTEDANCE INC, BYTEDANCE LTD, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC. (BRODY, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
11 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Petrocelli.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9415257.) by BYTEDANCE INC, BYTEDANCE LTD, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC. (PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. TIKTOK US DATA SECURITY INC waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. TIKTOK PTE LTD waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. TIKTOK LTD waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. TIKTOK INC waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. BYTEDANCE LTD waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATRICE LINDSEY. BYTEDANCE INC waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
4 4 Summons Issued as to TIKTOK PTE LTD. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 TIK TOK LTD SUMMONS,
Att: 2 TIK TOK INC SUMMONS,
Att: 3 BYTEDANCE INC SUMMONS,
Att: 4 BYTEDANCE LTD SUMMONS,
Att: 5 TIK TOK US DATA SECURITIES INC
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re1 Complaint, filed by KATRICE LINDSEY **TO ATTORNEY: CHARLES HALL:Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk**. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against BYTEDANCE LTD., BYTEDANCE, INC., TIKTOK INC, TIKTOK LTD, TIKTOK PTE LTD, TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9401332.), filed by KATRICE LINDSEY. (HALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for TikTok PTE LTD,
Att: 2 Summons for TikTok LTD,
Att: 3 Summons for TikTok Inc,
Att: 4 Summons for Bytedance LTD,
Att: 5 Summons for Bytedance Inc,
Att: 6 Summons for TikTok US Security Inc