H.T. v. ByteDance Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-03399 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 2:25-cv-14095 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 1:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
H.T.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/18 10:38 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for April 28, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 24, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
9 | 9
![]() ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Southern |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/14/25 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:25-cv-14095-AMC from U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida (Ft Pierce). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-03144-GW (RAOx). (car) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Civil Case Terminated, per8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Central District of California re: MDL 3144 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable George H. Wu. Closing Case. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/18/2025.] | ||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/26/2025. (jco) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/18/2025.] | |
5 | 5 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed St. Lucie (Office - Ft Pierce) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cwc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/18/2025.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
4 | 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc) Wrong venue selected by filer. Correction to Judge Assignment. Text Modified on 3/26/2025 (cwc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/18/2025.] | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/18/2025.] | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |