Original Case: 1:98-cv-01517

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-07053
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotels Corporation
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
James M. Anderson, Members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew J. Hart, Members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Barron Hilton
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dieter Huckestein, Members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sam D. Young, Jr., Members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jamal J. Kifafi, Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Stephen Robert Bruce
Stephen R. Bruce Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 5:13 AM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-7053
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2111725] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:98-cv-01517-CKK filed by Jamal J. Kifafi. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-7053 25-7053
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2111727] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/02/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/02/2025 25-7053
Related: [-]