Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:25-bk-10566
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Shoreview Holding LLC
9050 N Capital of Texas Hwy Ste 320 Bldg 3
Austin, TX 78759-7288
Represented By
Stephen J. Humeniuk
Locke Lord LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
33 33 motion ~Motion (Generic) Fri 05/02 11:18 AM
Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (F) Fri 05/02 8:02 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 6/3/2025 at 09:00 AM Via Phone: (866)711-2282; Code: 3544189#- Proofs of Claim Due 9/2/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Thu 05/01 4:07 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Further Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
30 30 order BK-Extend Time (pdf) Thu 05/01 11:44 AM
Order Allowing Extension of Time To May 23, 2025 Related [+] ,; (Order entered on 5/1/2025) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
29 29 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Thu 05/01 11:39 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/1/2025) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
28 28 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Thu 05/01 10:02 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),26 Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Order # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline)(Humeniuk, Stephen) (Related Document(s):6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order))
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 10:07 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
26 26 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 12:07 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
25 25 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 12:02 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Order
Att: 2 Appendix Ex. B - Redline
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Revised Utility Provider
24 24 motion ~Motion (Generic) Wed 04/30 11:54 AM
Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Ryan Elliott Manns for Creditor Prime Finance Short Duration Holding Company VII, LLC(Manns, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 motion ~Motion (Generic) Wed 04/30 11:44 AM
Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Ryan Elliott Manns for Creditor Prime Finance Short Duration Holding Company VII, LLC(Manns, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 11:42 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Interim Order #2 Proposed Final Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
21 21 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 11:35 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
20 20 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 11:26 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Revised Proposed
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
19 19 misc Exhibit Index and Witness List Wed 04/30 11:15 AM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on 4/30/2025 filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Interim Order #2 Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),11 Omnibus Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Related Document(s):2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order))
18 18 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Wed 04/30 10:59 AM
Notice of Filing Proposed Order filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.(Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Redline
17 17 misc ~Document Wed 04/30 10:39 AM
First Day Hearing Agenda filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc ~Document Wed 04/30 9:42 AM
Debtors' Attorney Cash Collateral Checklist filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Wed 04/30 2:06 PM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 4/30/25 TO 5/28/25 Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT...COURT HAS SET THIS HEARING AS A HYBRID HEARING; PARTIES MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY ZOOMNOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Wed 04/30 2:08 PM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 4/30/25 TO 5/28/25 Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT...COURT HAS SET THIS HEARING AS A HYBRID HEARING; PARTIES MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY ZOOMNOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Wed 04/30 2:09 PM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 4/30/25 TO 5/28/25 Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT...COURT HAS SET THIS HEARING AS A HYBRID HEARING; PARTIES MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY ZOOMNOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Wed 04/30 2:12 PM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 4/30/25 TO 5/28/25 Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 5/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT...COURT HAS SET THIS HEARING AS A HYBRID HEARING; PARTIES MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY ZOOMNOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:42 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD INTERIM ORDER; FINAL HEARING 5/28/25 AT 1:30 PM ACT 1 Related [+] (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:43 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD - INTERIM ORDER; FINAL HRG: 5//28/25 1:30 PM ; DB EXHIBIT 1 ADMITTED. Related [+] (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:46 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD; INTERIM ORDER - FINAL HEARING 5/28/25 AT 1:30 PM; OTC BY MOVANT; DEBTOR'S EXHIBIT 1 & 2 ADMITTED Related [+] Order due by 5/14/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Interim Order #2 Proposed Final Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:47 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD - INTERIM ORDER; OTC BY MOVANT - FINAL HRG: 5/28/25 1:30 PM ; DEBTOR'S EXHIBIT 1 (Ecf no. 25-3) ADMITTED. Related [+] Order due by 5/14/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:49 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD; OTC BY DEBTOR Related [+] Order due by 5/14/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:50 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED AS STATED ON THE RECORD- EXTENSION TO 5/23/25; OTC BY DEBTOR. Related [+] (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:51 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED; OTC BY DEBTOR Related [+] Order due by 5/14/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.
court Hearing Held Fri 05/02 11:57 AM
Hearing Held: APPROVED- (LEAD CASE WILL BE 25-10566 SMR); ORDER IN THE FILE TO BE ENTERED. Related [+] Order due by 5/14/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/29 1:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Stephen M Pezanosky for Creditor Pearlmark Mezzanine Realty Partners V Holdings, LLC. (Pezanosky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/29 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Ryan Elliott Manns for Creditor Prime Finance Short Duration Holding Company VII, LLC. (Manns, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 10:23 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Related Document(s):2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),11 Omnibus Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Related Document(s):2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)))
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/29 9:26 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 4/30/2025 at 11:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 COURT HAS SET THIS HEARING AS A HYBRID HEARING; PARTIES MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY ZOOMNOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC., 3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC ,9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 misc Notice of Hearing Mon 04/28 11:53 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),11 Omnibus Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Related Document(s):2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order))
11 11 motion Expedite Hearing Mon 04/28 11:28 PM
Omnibus Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC.,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
10 10 25 pgs misc ~Document Mon 04/28 10:53 PM
Declaration of Monte Lee-Wen in Support of Debtors' Petitions and First Day Pleadings filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Shoreview Holding LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 05/1/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 08/22/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2025,,3 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order),9 Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
9 9 motion Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) Mon 04/28 10:35 PM
Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Under Section 366(b) filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion ~Motion (Generic) Mon 04/28 10:20 PM
Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (I) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MAINTAIN EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND (II) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS AND BOOKS AND RECORDS filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) Mon 04/28 9:10 PM
Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Creditors filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 04/28 5:40 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion ~Motion (Generic) Mon 04/28 11:13 AM
Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS (I) TO REDACT CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION; (II) TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CREDITOR MATRIX AND (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Extend Time Mon 04/28 11:09 AM
Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Equity Holder Lists filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST Shane P. Tobin (Tobin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 motion Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases Fri 04/25 4:51 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC(Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc ~Document Fri 04/25 4:48 PM
Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Stephen J. Humeniuk for Debtor Shoreview Holding LLC. (Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Shoreview Holding LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 05/1/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 08/22/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2025, (Humeniuk, Stephen)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Thu 04/24 1:22 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-10566 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25298492 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1