Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03333
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:25-cv-01320
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Represented By
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc
Represented By
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J.O.
Represented By
Kristen Cardoso
Kopelowitz Ostrow PA
contact info
Respondent
TikTok Ltd
Represented By
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Respondent
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 2:50 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/28 8:57 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for April 28, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Counsel may appear telephonically by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:39 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
27 27 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Fri 04/25 9:35 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/14/2025 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:25-cv-01320-JD from Northern District of California (San Francisco). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-3144-GW (RAOx). (et)
Related: [-]
26 26 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Fri 04/25 9:01 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-1) by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, MDL No. 3144 (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
case electronically transmitted to the Central District of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
24 24 STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 for extension of time for briefing schedule re 22 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by J.O., TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 STIPULATION Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(A) for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to re 1 Complaint filed by TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 MOTION to Transfer Case; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/8/2025. Replies due by 4/15/2025.(Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian O'Connor In Support of Defendants' Motion To Transfer,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Transfer
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Rita F. Lin no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/18/2025. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Brody. (mkl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.O... (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
16 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc... (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok Inc. for TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.; Corporate Parent TikTok Ltd. for TikTok Pte. Ltd.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Ltd.; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for TikTok Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20461228.) filed by ByteDance, Inc.. (Brody, Stephen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew David Powers on behalf of TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of TikTok Inc., ByteDance, Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. Service waived by TikTok Ltd. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. Service waived by TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. Service waived by TikTok Pte. Ltd. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. Service waived by ByteDance, Ltd. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.O.. Service waived by ByteDance, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; TikTok Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/17/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 1:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2025. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by J.O. . (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Use Updated Civil Cover Sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Complaint, filed by J.O. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok Pte. Ltd., and TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc., (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20326015). Filed by J.O..(Cardoso, Kristen) Modified on 2/11/2025 (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 form which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. Section IX Divisional Assignment response is missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by J.O. (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]