Consolidated
Lead case: 2:25-ml-03144

California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-03336
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:25-cv-02097
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 8:01 PM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Brody
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tatiana Brodiski
Represented By
Christopher Londergan Springer
Keller Rohrback LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Burda
Represented By
Christopher Londergan Springer
Keller Rohrback LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
32 32 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/30 12:57 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are notified that all parties and attorneys in the tag-along actions have been added to the In Re: Tiktok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation, 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx matter. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in 25-ml-3144-GW-RAOx which will be the lead case. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
31 31 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Tue 04/29 8:42 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/29 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Mon 04/28 4:21 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
29 29 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Tue 04/29 8:36 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/14/2025 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:25-cv-02097-JD from Northern District of California (San Francisco). Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:25-ml-3144-GW (RAOx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
27 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re23 MOTION to Transfer Case / Stipulation Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(B) For Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion for Transfer filed by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc..(Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Cari Laufenberg
Friday, March 28, 2025
Set/Reset Deadlines as to23 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
26 26 Renotice motion hearing re23 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byTikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc.. Related [+] (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-] 23
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event date used.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:24 Renotice motion hearing filed by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re23 MOTION to Transfer Case ,24 Renotice motion hearing STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(B) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER filed by Tatiana Brodiski, Steven Burda.(Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Chris Springer
24 24 Renotice motion hearing re23 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byTikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc.. Related [+] (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
23 23 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/2/2025. Replies due by 4/9/2025.(Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian O'Connor,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Rita F. Lin no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/18/2025. (lrc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Brody. (mkl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 STIPULATION Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(A) For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok Inc., Other Affiliate TikTok Ltd. for TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC, Other Affiliate TikTok Ltd. for TikTok Inc.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20453577.) filed by TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc.. (Brody, Stephen) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew David Powers on behalf of TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc. (Powers, Matthew) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc., ByteDance Inc. (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-08051-JD. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 3/10/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT: Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] . Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tatiana Brodiski, Steven Burda.. (Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tatiana Brodiski, Steven Burda (Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Brodiski, Steven Burda. All Defendants. (Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.. (kam2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Proposed Summons. (Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kam2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Disregard, Issued in Error Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.. (kam2, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/4/2025 (kam2, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20401110.). Filed by Tatiana Brodiski, Steven Burda.(Springer, Christopher) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet