Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:25-bk-10649
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 26, 2025

Debtor
606 Cliff, LLC
603 Cliff Dr
Austin, TX 78704-1414
Represented By
Denise A. True
Denise A. True, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 12:06 AM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Fri 05/02 4:01 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 25-10649 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A25321711 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Fri 05/02 2:30 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By 606 Cliff, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 05/9/2025 (True, Denise)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 05/02 2:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/26/2025 at 09:00 AM at Zoom - Lowe: Meeting ID 6657174178, Passcode 3258264599, OR call 830-542-7284. (True, Denise)
Related: [-]