Original Case: 5:23-cv-05105

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01889
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:59 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
Tim Griffin, In his Official Capacity as Attorney General of Arkansas
Represented By
Jordan Broyles
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Noah P. Watson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Justin Brascher
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Laura L. Purvis
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
John Otho Payne
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NetChoice, LLC
Represented By
Katherine Church Campbell
FRIDAY & ELDREDGE
contact info
James Y. Xi
CLEMENT & MURPHY
contact info
Marshall S. Ney
FRIDAY & ELDREDGE
contact info
Paul D. Clement
CLEMENT & MURPHY
contact info
Joseph DeMott
CLEMENT & MURPHY
contact info
Erin Murphy
CLEMENT & MURPHY
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 3:59 AM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5512862] 25-1889 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 3/31/2025, Judgment dated 3/31/2025 [5512863] 25-1889 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 06/11/2025. Appendix due 06/23/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Tim Griffin due 06/23/2025
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5512866] 25-1889 (RDB)
Related: [-]